SHIRE US, INC. v. ALLERGAN, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | John Michael Vazquez |
Referred: | Steven C Mannion |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07716 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 31, 2018 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
ALLERGAN SALES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV JOSHUA S. BARLOW
|
|
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL F. BROCKMEYER
|
|
Notice Only
PHV RICHARD H. CUNNINGHAM
|
|
Notice Only
PHV AMANDA J. HAMILTON
|
|
Notice Only
PHV FRED A. KELLY, JR.
|
|
Notice Only
PHV Jason C. McKenney
|
|
Notice Only
PHV M. Sean Royall
|
|
Notice Only
PHV DAVID S. SHOTLANDER
|
|
Plaintiff
SHIRE US, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
111 | 111
2
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Fri 06/19 4:01 PM
ORDER of Dismissal re110 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/19/2020. (dam, ) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
110 | 110
misc
Letter
Thu 06/18 1:36 PM
Letter from Plaintiff to the Honorable John Michael Vazquez, U.S.D.J..(KURZ, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |