Hurt v. Clever Investor LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03373 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 28, 2018 2:01 AM MST |
Defendant
Clever Investor LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Marlen Hurt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/20 7:52 AM
ORDER granting25 Stipulation of Dismissal: The Plaintiff's claims shall be dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal is effective as to all parties and all claims. All Writs of Attachment or Garnishment issued in this action, if any, are dismissed and quashed, and any bond heretofore filed with the Clerk of this Court are exonerated. In the event that any party has filed a cash bond with the Clerk, the Clerk is directed to return that cash bond to the party posting the bond or to his attorneys. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/17/18. (DXD) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/16 4:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Clever Investor LLC.(Huser, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 08/03 11:35 AM
ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on 8/31/2018 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/30/2018. (MMO) |
|
Saturday, July 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Settlement
Sat 07/28 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Clever Investor LLC. (Huser, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Telephone Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 07/19 1:20 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/19/2018. The Court is advised that discovery is complete and dispositive motions will be filed. The Court will set trial after dispositive motions are resolved. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Eric O'Connor for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Ronald Huser for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 10:35 AM to 10:39 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 07/18 8:28 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Reset Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference. Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 9:30 is reset in time only to 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/17/2018. (MMO) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Continue
Sat 07/14 8:42 AM
MOTION to Continue Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference by Clever Investor LLC.(Huser, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Resetting Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/13 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 4:30 PM is RESET IN TIME ONLY. Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference reset for 7/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/30 1:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2018. Telephonic Pre-motion Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/30/2018. (MMO) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Tue 01/30 1:52 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/30/2018. Deadlines discussed. Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Eric O-Connor for Plaintiff. Ronald Huser for Defendant Clever Investor LLC. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 1:34 PM to 1:49 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 01/30 1:35 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/30/2018. (MMO) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/29 3:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clever Investor LLC. (Huser, Ronald) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear
Mon 01/29 2:23 PM
Emergency MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Marlen Hurt. (O'Connor, Eric) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
Mon 01/29 2:12 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Marlen Hurt. (O'Connor, Eric) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Time Change Only - Hearing
Thu 01/25 3:57 PM
IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference presently set for 1/30/2018 at 4:30 PM is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY!! Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 1/30/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes. (MMO)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/25 9:22 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Clever Investor LLC. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Wed 01/10 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Marlen Hurt. (O'Connor, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 11/22 1:36 PM
ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/22/2017. (MMO) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/21 6:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Clever Investor LLC.(Huser, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Tue 10/03 10:20 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/2/2017. (MMO) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Mon 10/02 2:16 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Marlen Hurt. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/02 2:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Clever Investor LLC. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Mon 10/02 2:12 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SLQ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 10/02 2:11 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14707895. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-03373 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SLQ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 10/02 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Marlen Hurt (submitted by Eric O'Connor). (SLQ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/02 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14707895 filed by Marlen Hurt (submitted by Eric O'Connor).(SLQ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |