California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:17-cv-07304
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Nov 18, 2017 2:04 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Michael Lee Aday
Defendant
Edward B. Marks Music Company
Defendant
James Richard Steinman
Plaintiff
Enclosed Music LLC
Represented By
Eduardo Martorell
Bordin Martorell LLP
contact info
Christopher Michael Blanchard
Bordin Martorell LLP
contact info
Angelo Mishriki
Bordin Martorell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/10/2017 11:59 PM PST
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 3:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
12 12 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89) Mon 3:47 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-07304 FMO(Ex). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:17-cv-07304 CBM(Ex). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
10 10 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party Wed 12:54 PM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Plaintiff Enclosed Music LLC. The Plaintiff does not consent. (Mishriki, Angelo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2017
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 12:57 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Michael Lee Aday, Does, Edward B. Marks Music Company, James Richard Steinman. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (vm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
8 8 notice Summons Request Thu 1:29 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form6 , Summons Request,5 filed by Plaintiff Enclosed Music LLC. (Martorell, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Thu 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request,5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Remove "et al " from the Summons caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Thu 11:00 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
5 5 notice Summons Request Wed 4:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Enclosed Music LLC. (Martorell, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Wed 4:07 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Enclosed Music LLC. (Martorell, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Enclosed Music LLC, (Martorell, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Enclosed Music LLC. (Martorell, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20613185 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Enclosed Music LLC. (Attorney Eduardo Martorell added to party Enclosed Music LLC(pty:pla))(Martorell, Eduardo)
Related: [-]