BCL One, LLC
North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Lena M James |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-51061 |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
BCL One, LLC
PO Box 4124
Salisbury, NC 28145-4124 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Bankruptcy Administrator
William P. Miller
Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401 |
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 12:01 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 12/20 12:21 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Shoffner, T.) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 11
Mon 11/27 11:49 AM
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held (Grissom, S.) |
||
Sunday, November 19, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 11/20 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
46 | 46
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Dismissing Case
Mon 11/20 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Dismissing Case. Notice Date 11/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
court
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 11/17 4:20 PM
Notice of Dismissal. (Hamrick, C.) |
|
43 | 43
order
Dismiss Case
Fri 11/17 4:18 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank) . (Hamrick, C.) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors Continued - Chapter 11
Thu 11/09 11:29 AM
Statement of Adjournment of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors as reported by the Bankruptcy Administrator, Presiding Officer. 341(a) meeting continued to 11/27/2017 at 11:00 AM at Creditors Mtg Room, Winston-Salem. (Grissom, S.) |
||
Sunday, November 05, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 11/06 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing
Sat 11/04 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing Notice Date 11/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
40 | 40
order
Extend Automatic Stay
Fri 11/03 5:00 PM
Order Denying Motion to Extend Automatic Sta (Hamrick, C.) |
|
39 | 39
audio
Fri 11/03 10:42 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/1/2017 2:17:08 PM ]. File Size [ 39023 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:48:24 ]. (1. *3* Motion by Bankruptcy Administrator for Status Hearing). (admin) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
court
Notice of Tentative Hearing 21
Wed 11/01 11:21 AM
Notice of Tentative Hearing . Objections are due 11/24/2017. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 12/13/2017 at 02:00 PM Courtroom, Winston-Salem for36 , (Whitesell, S.) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 11/02 2:47 PM
Hearing Held (Leonard, J.) |
||
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Thu 11/02 2:47 PM
Hearing Held (Leonard, J.) |
||
court
Court Minutes no document alt
Fri 11/03 2:21 PM
Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: November 1, 2017. Appearances: Charles Ivey, Attorney for Debtor; B. Clay Lindsay, Debtor; George Sanderson, Attorney for FNB; WITNESS AFFIRMED AND TESTIFIED (BOBBY CLAY LINDSAY), WITNESS AFFIRMED AND TESTIFIED (SAMUEL OOTS from FNB) Debtor's Exhibit 1 and 2 Marked and Admitted; FNB's Exhibit 1, 2, and 3 Marked and Admitted ORDERED: 1. Status Hearing Held; 2. Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Denied as Moot, O - Ivey; 3. Motion to Dismiss Case MATTER UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Leonard, J.) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Support Document
Tue 10/31 2:59 PM
Support Document EXHIBIT A TO COS Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC . (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Employ
Tue 10/31 2:41 PM
Application to Employ Jayne Helms of Re/Max Leading Edge as real estate broker Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Amended Schedules
Tue 10/31 1:55 PM
Amended Schedules-Statements filed: Schedule A/B,add A/R;. Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC. (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Joinder in Motion
Mon 10/30 2:34 PM
Joinder in Motion Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller . (Miller, William) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/26 3:16 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank) . (Sanderson, George) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Expedite Hearing
Wed 10/25 1:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing . Counsel shall serve pursuant to terms in order and file a certificate of service. Hearing Scheduled 11/1/17 at 2:00 pm, Courtroom Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Response
Wed 10/25 12:26 PM
Response to Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank) (Sanderson, George) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Expedite Hearing
Wed 10/25 12:03 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank) (Sanderson, George) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 10/25 11:59 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank) (Sanderson, George) |
|
court
Hearing Set (No BNC Notice)
Wed 10/25 1:10 PM
Hearing Set ) Hearing scheduled 11/1/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.) |
||
Saturday, October 14, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Sun 10/15 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 10/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 10/14 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/13 12:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul A. Fanning Filed by Creditors First Carolina Bank, Capital Bank, N.A.. (Fanning, Paul) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 10/13 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 10/13 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Fri 10/13 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing
Fri 10/13 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 10/13 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Supplemental Document
Thu 10/12 2:39 PM
Supplemental Document evidence of payment pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 361, 362 Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC . (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Thu 10/12 7:34 AM
Hearing Set Hearing scheduled 11/1/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/11 3:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lauren A. Golden Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank). (Golden, Lauren) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/11 2:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by George Franklin Sanderson III Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank). (Sanderson, George) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/11 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Charles N. Anderson Jr. Filed by Creditor First National Bank of Pennsylvania(successor-by-merger to Yadkin Bank). (Anderson, Charles) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extend Automatic Stay
Wed 10/11 2:26 PM
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay PROVISIONS OF 11 U.S.C. SECTION 362 Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
14 | 14
order
Designating Party to Act on behalf of Corp/Partnership
Wed 10/11 12:14 PM
Order Designating B. Clay Lindsay, Jr. to Act on behalf of Corporate.. (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Designation of Depository
Tue 10/10 3:04 PM
Designation of Depository: Suntrust Bank, 31 Union Street, Concord, NC 28025 (Hamrick, C.) |
|
12 | 12
court
Missing Documents Due
Tue 10/10 11:39 AM
Missing Documents Due: Corporate Resolution due by 10/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 10/20/2017. (Shoffner, T.) |
|
11 | 11
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Tue 10/10 11:18 AM
Status Hearing Set Hearing scheduled 11/1/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.) |
|
10 | 10
court
Memo to DIP Attorney re: Duties
Tue 10/10 11:03 AM
Amended Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties. Amended to reflect correct plan and disclosure statement deadline. (Hamrick, C.) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/10 10:36 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC . (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
8 | 8
court
Notice of Tentative Hearing 21
Tue 10/10 9:32 AM
Notice of Tentative Hearing . Objections are due 11/2/2017. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 11/15/2017 at 02:00 PM Courtroom, Winston-Salem for2 . (Hamrick, C.) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 10/10 9:29 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) Meeting to be held on 11/9/2017 at 11:00 AM at Creditors Mtg Room, Winston-Salem. Proofs of Claims due by 2/7/2018. (Hamrick, C.) |
|
6 | 6
court
Memo to DIP Attorney re: Duties
Tue 10/10 8:54 AM
Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties (Hamrick, C.) |
|
5 | 5
order
Chapter 11 Operating Order
Tue 10/10 8:51 AM
Chapter 11 Operating Order. (Hamrick, C.) |
|
court
5-Alpha Case Admin Assignment
Tue 10/10 10:23 AM
Case reassigned to Tiffany S. 336-358-4030 (Martin, D.) |
||
Sunday, October 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
trustee
Memo re: No Formation of Creditors Committee
Sun 10/08 9:35 PM
Bankruptcy Administrator's Memo Regarding No Formation of Creditors Committee Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Miller, William) |
|
3 | 3
trustee
Motion for Status Hearing
Sun 10/08 9:30 PM
Bankruptcy Administrators Motion for Status Hearing Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Miller, William) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Employ
Fri 10/06 4:45 PM
Application to Employ Ivey, McClellan, Gatton & Siegmund, LLP as attorneys for Debtor in Possession Filed by Debtor BCL One, LLC (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 10/06 4:32 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by BCL One, LLC Court enters deficiencies (Brumbaugh, Samantha) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 10/06 4:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-51061 [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 7623979, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |