Kamplain v. Berryhill
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Martin Reidinger |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00180 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 05/20 8:51 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/19/2019. (nvc) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 04/17 9:18 AM
Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dixie Pless Kamplain. Responses due by 5/1/2019(Patton, Amelia) |
|
Att: 1 Record of Time Spent, | ||
Att: 2 Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Dec of Net Worth, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 02/14 10:14 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/14/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nvc) |
|
17 | 17
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment-Social Security
Thu 02/14 10:12 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Defendant's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. The decision of the Commissioner is reversed and the case is remanded for further administrative proceedings. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/14/2019. (nvc) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 08/08 4:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Social Security by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Kazadi, Kaba-Kabi) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment - Social Security
Wed 08/08 3:59 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment - Social Security by Nancy A. Berryhill. Responses due by 8/22/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Kazadi, Kaba-Kabi) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 07/09 10:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to file SS Brief Government SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/8/2018. Text of Order: The Defendant's motion is GRANTED, and the Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including August 8, 2018, within which to file a motion for summary judgment. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/9/18. (LMR) |
||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/06 1:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Govt's Motion for Summary Judgment by Nancy A. Berryhill. Responses due by 7/20/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail(Kazadi, Kaba-Kabi) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, May 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Sat 05/05 9:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Social Security by Dixie Pless Kamplain.(Patton, Amelia) |
|
Att: 1 Unpublished Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Unpublished Decision, | ||
Att: 3 Unpublished Decision | ||
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment - Social Security
Sat 05/05 9:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment - Social Security by Dixie Pless Kamplain. (Patton, Amelia) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 04/11 10:40 AM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2018. Government SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/9/2018. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/11/2018. (nvc) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/06 10:20 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Dixie Pless Kamplain. Responses due by 4/20/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail(Patton, Amelia) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 03/06 2:31 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Dixie Pless Kamplain. Responses due by 3/20/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail(Patton, Amelia) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 03/06 3:17 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to file SS Briefs Government SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/8/2018. Plaintiff SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/9/2018. Text of Order: The Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including April 9, 2018, within which to file a motion for summary judgment. The Defendant's deadline is similarly extended to June 8, 2018. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/6/18. (LMR) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Mon 01/08 8:34 AM
TEXT-ONLY Social Security Scheduling Order. It Appearing to the Court that the defendant Commissioner has answered and filed transcripts herein, that the issues are ripe for this Court's Review. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.2. (Plaintiff shall be permitted one response within 14 days after the filing of Commissioner's Motion) Plaintiff SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/9/2018. Government SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/8/2018. (nvc) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Administrative Record - Social Security Transcript
Fri 01/05 3:19 PM
Administrative Record - Social Security Transcript(Kazadi, Kaba-Kabi) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/05 3:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Kazadi, Kaba-Kabi) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/05 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kaba-Kabi A. Kazadi on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Kazadi, Kaba-Kabi) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 10/30 7:35 AM
Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Nancy A. Berryhill, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (tmg) |
|
Att: 1 USM 285 Forms | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/30 7:26 AM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall deliver process to US Marshal for service. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/28/2017. (tmg) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/06 2:26 PM
MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dixie Pless Kamplain. (Patton, Amelia) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/06 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dixie Pless Kamplain.(Patton, Amelia) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/06 3:32 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg) |