Orr et al v. USA
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Referred: | Mark L Carman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02420 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 04, 2018 2:59 AM MDT |
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Carman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lena Carman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Orr
|
Represented By
|
1. | Victims of the 2013 Colorado floods file lawsuit against federal government (kdvr.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Fri 03/02 12:00 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal filed in this case on 3/1/18. Text Only Entry (dkals, ) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Thu 03/01 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiffs Howard Carman, Lena Carman, Elizabeth Orr (Matise, Brian) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 02/15 12:30 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant USA may have an extension of time, up to and including 3/2/2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. By Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman on 2/15/2018. Text Only Entry (cbslc2) |
|
13 | 13
order
Memorandum
Thu 02/15 12:03 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/15/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 02/15 11:38 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint,, by Defendant USA. (Moskowitz, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order
Wed 01/03 9:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Scheduling Conference for 3/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman. ORDERED that parties shall adhere to the deadlines and instructions as set forth in[LINK:Preparation for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference] , located on the court's website under "Judicial Officers." Parties participating in the hearing shall initiate a conference call among themselves before calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman on 1/3/18. (amont, ) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed as to USA - Complaint
Fri 12/29 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon U.S. Department of Justice(Matise, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed as to USA - Complaint
Wed 12/27 11:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon United States of America - Department of the Interior - Bureau of Reclamation - Great Plains Regional Office defendant(s) USA served on 12/21/2017, answer due 2/20/2018.(Matise, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed as to USA - Complaint
Wed 12/20 1:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Brob Troyer, US Attorney - Colorado defendant(s) USA served on 12/18/2017, answer due 2/16/2018. (Matise, Brian) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 12/15 8:43 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Reassigning Magistrate Judge Carman
Wed 11/08 11:02 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: During Magistrate Judge Shaffer's unavailability, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman of the District of Wyoming, who is substituted as the referral judge. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Carman at the end of the civil action number (such as 17-cv-0001-MSK-MLC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all scheduled matters will be maintained. Parties shall continue to communicate with Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers regarding this case. (Text only entry - no document attached) (cthom, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minute Order
Tue 10/10 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/10/2017. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 10/10 10:25 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/10/2017. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 10/06 4:53 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rroge, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 10/06 4:51 PM
Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/06 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5746622)Attorney Brian Keith Matise added to party Howard Carman(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Keith Matise added to party Lena Carman(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Keith Matise added to party Elizabeth Orr(pty:pla), filed by Elizabeth Orr, Lena Carman, Howard Carman.(Matise, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons - United States of America, c/o Department of the Interior - Bureau of Reclamation - Great Plains Regional Office, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons - United States of America, c/o U.S. Attorney - Colorado |