ProFlo Industries, LLC
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Ann Whipple |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-33184 |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jan 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
ProFlo Industries, LLC
2679 US 23
Alvada, OH 44802 |
Represented By
|
Accountant
Gregory E. Coward
|
|
Creditor
American Express Bank, FSB
|
|
Creditor
First Federal Bank of Midwest
|
|
Creditor
Marshall & Melhorn, LLC
|
|
Creditor
Marshall Bennett Jr.
|
|
Creditor
SkyMark Refuelers, LLC
|
|
Creditor
The Huntington National Bank a national banking association
|
|
Debtor
ProFlo Industries, LLC
|
|
Examiner
Patricia Fugee
|
|
Interested Party
Terry N. Bosserman
|
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
court
ADI Returned Mail
Fri 04/17 8:00 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 02/15/2020 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form 264 to: 20 Meggitt North Hollywood, Inc. 2616 Research Dr. Corona, CA 92882-6978. (ADIrm adi) |
||
Saturday, April 11, 2020 | ||
court
ADI Returned Mail
Mon 04/13 8:00 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/11/2020 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf722 to: 20 Meggitt North Hollywood, Inc. 2616 Research Dr. Corona, CA 92882-6978. (ADIrm adi) |