CAPTAIN TRANSPORT & RECOVERY, INC.
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | William J Fisher |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-33195 |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 09, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
CAPTAIN TRANSPORT & RECOVERY, INC.
1800 HWY 13 W
BURNSVILLE, MN 55337 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago |
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
108 | 108
order
MNB Vacate - motion
Tue 12/15 5:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to vacate (David T MNB) |
|
court
MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order
Tue 12/15 10:28 AM
Minutes re: No appearance. Granted by default. (Kristin) |
||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
107 | 107
answer
MNB Response of no objection
Wed 12/09 8:21 AM
Response of no objection by U.S. Trustee US Trustee to106 Motion to vacate. (Wencil, Sarah) |