Harley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas B Smith |
Referred: | Thomas B Smith |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01738 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 05/09 4:08 PM
ORDER granting 22 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/9/2019. (Smith, Thomas) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 05/09 8:36 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct21 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees regarding costs and expenses by Wayne Robert Harley. (Harris, Suzanne) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 05/01 6:05 PM
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/1/2019.(KWH) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 04/30 5:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C.A. § 2412 (West) by Wayne Robert Harley.(Harris, Suzanne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-All Professional Time, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Attorney Suzanne Harris, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Attorney Howard D. Olinsky, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Attorney Matthew McGarry, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Attorney Edward A. Wicklund, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F- Paralegal Michelle Callahan, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Paralegal Jonnah Graser, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H0 Paralegal Jennifer Overfield, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I- Paralegal Tamica Lockwood, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J- Paralegal Vincent Wisehoon, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K- Paralegal Kyrsten Gifford, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit l- Paralegal Moira Deutch, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M- Paralegal Michael Smith, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N- Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O- Expenses, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P - Consumer Price Index Calculations Table, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q- NALA 2016 National Utilization and Compensation Survey Report, | ||
Att: 18 Local Rule, | ||
Att: 19 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Judgment
Wed 01/30 8:32 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Wayne Robert Harley against Commissioner of Social Security. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JP) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
*Order pdf
Tue 01/29 12:37 PM
FINAL OPINION AND ORDER reversing the Commissioner's decision and remanding for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/29/2019. (KWH) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Memorandum social security - defendant
Tue 06/05 2:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of the Commissioner's decision Joint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/23 10:59 AM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:17-cv-1738-Orl-TBS. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/22 3:10 PM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/22/2018. (SC) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Mon 01/22 10:44 AM
Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Joint Memorandum due by 6/19/2018 (RDO) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order - Social Security
Fri 01/19 3:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/19/2018.(KWH) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Social security transcript
Thu 01/18 9:32 AM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re11 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix, | ||
Att: 9 Appendix, | ||
Att: 10 Appendix, | ||
Att: 11 Appendix, | ||
Att: 12 Appendix | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/18 9:30 AM
CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/18 9:29 AM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Wed 12/27 11:14 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Wayne Robert Harley. Commissioner of Social Security/U.S. Attorney served on 11/22/2017, answer due 1/22/2018. (DMA) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of service
Mon 12/18 4:26 PM
PROOF of service on 11/27/17 as to the Office of Regional Counsel, SSA by Wayne Robert Harley (RDO) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of service
Mon 12/18 4:25 PM
PROOF of service on 12/5/17 as to the US Attorney General by Wayne Robert Harley (RDO) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued as to USA
Thu 10/19 3:16 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RDO) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
Fri 10/13 4:06 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/13/2017. (Smith, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 10/12 10:09 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wayne Robert Harley. Related case(s): No (Harris, Suzanne) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Wed 10/11 10:59 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/11/2017. (counsel emailed)(AKJ) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
SS Standing Order
Tue 10/10 3:16 PM
ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (RDO) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
Tue 10/10 3:15 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Wayne Robert Harley. (RDO) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Wayne Robert Harley.(RDO) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |