Barnes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas G Wilson |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-02362 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 02/15 6:14 PM
ORDER granting 31 Plaintiff's Uncontested Petition for EAJA Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2312(d) to the extent that the plaintiff is awarded the amount of $7205.50 in an attorney's fee, to be paid to the plaintiff's counsel by the defendant pursuant to the EAJA if the plaintiff is not indebted to the United States Department of the Treasury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/15/2019. (DMS) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 11/20 7:52 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2312(d) by Susan Marie Barnes.(Avard, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attorney Fee Contract, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Craig Polhemus | ||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Tue 09/11 1:22 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Susan Marie Barnes against Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2018. (AG) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to Agency
Tue 09/11 11:31 AM
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Remand to Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the plaintiff and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/10/2018. (DMS) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Remand to agency
Mon 09/10 3:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION to remand to Commissioner of Social Security Under Sentence Four by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/08 10:45 AM
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time until September 12, 2018, to File Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/8/2018. (Wilson, Thomas) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/08 7:19 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum of Law until September 12, 2018 by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Memorandum social security - plaintiff
Thu 06/14 4:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in opposition to the Commissioner's decision filed by Susan Marie Barnes.(Polhemus, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Job Specialty Report for a Small Products Assembler, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Job Specialty Report for a Cleaner Housekeeping, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Job Specialty Report for a Laborer Stores, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Listing of Matching Job Specialty Titles for OES Group 37-2012 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Order Dated 11/14/12 | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 06/13 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Edward Polhemus on behalf of Susan Marie Barnes (Polhemus, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on motion to extend time
Wed 05/30 12:06 PM
ORDER granting 22 Motion to extend time until June 14, 2018, to file memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/30/2018. (Wilson, Thomas) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extend time
Wed 05/30 7:40 AM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file the Memorandum of Law by Susan Marie Barnes. (Avard, Carol) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on motion to extend time
Mon 04/30 11:11 AM
ORDER granting 20 Motion to extend time until May 30, 2018, to file Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/30/2018. (Wilson, Thomas) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extend time
Mon 04/30 9:11 AM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file the Memorandum of Law by Susan Marie Barnes. (Avard, Carol) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/01 3:59 PM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/1/2018. (SAT) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order - Social Security
Thu 03/01 6:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff memorandum due by 4/30/2018, Defendant memorandum due by 6/28/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/28/2018. (DMS) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Social security transcript
Wed 02/28 3:14 PM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re15 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix, | ||
Att: 9 Appendix, | ||
Att: 10 Appendix, | ||
Att: 11 Appendix, | ||
Att: 12 Appendix, | ||
Att: 13 Appendix | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/28 3:09 PM
CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/28 3:08 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on motion for extension of time to answer
Mon 01/22 5:03 PM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Commissioner of Social Security answer or response due 3/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/22/2018. (Wilson, Thomas) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 01/22 10:57 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until March 1, 2018 by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of service
Mon 12/04 1:18 PM
PROOF of service as to Attorney General by Susan Marie Barnes (BES) |
|
11 | 11
service
Proof of service
Mon 12/04 1:18 PM
PROOF of service as to Office of Regional Counsel by Susan Marie Barnes (BES) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Mon 12/04 1:17 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Susan Marie Barnes. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/1/2017, answer due 1/30/2018. (BES) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons issued as to USA
Mon 10/30 3:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BES) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 10/23 2:01 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re7 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Susan Marie Barnes. Related case(s): no (Avard, Carol) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Wed 10/11 11:44 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/11/2017. (SAT) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on motion for leave to proceed In forma pauperis
Tue 10/10 4:22 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/10/2017. (Wilson, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
order
SS Standing Order
Tue 10/10 4:03 PM
ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (LSS) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Memorandum in support
Tue 10/10 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susan Marie Barnes. (LSS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of indigency
Tue 10/10 4:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of indigency by Susan Marie Barnes. (LSS) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 10/10 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Marie Barnes. (LSS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Susan Marie Barnes.(LSS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |