Nhim v. Hodgson
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-11933 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 08, 2018 4:54 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Nhoueth Nhim
Suffolk County House of Correction 20 Bradston Street
Boston, MA 02118 |
|
Respondent
Thomas M. Hodgson
Warden, Bristol Country House of Correction Sheriff ol County House of Correction 400 Faunce Corner Road
North Dartmouth, MA 02747 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 01/23 3:36 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable: " Release " re4 Order, Mail sent to Nhoueth Nhim Suffolk County House of Correction 20 Bradston Street Boston, MA 02118 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 12/18 1:51 PM
Copy re17 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,18 Order Dismissing Case, Mailed to Nhoueth Nhim Suffolk County House of Correction 20 Bradston Street Boston, MA 02118 on 12/18/2017. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 12/18 1:49 PM
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 12/18 1:36 PM
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris:Endorsed ORDER entered " ALLOWED WITHOUT OPPOSITION AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE in light of the difficulty in finding the petitioner " re9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 12/06 2:05 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 12/06 1:39 PM
NOTICE by Thomas M. Hodgson re4 Service Order - 2241 Petition,,,,, Government's Notice Of Proposed Transfer From Massachusetts (Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 11/28 4:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. Petitioner Nhoueth Nhim has not yet indicated whether he consents to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge for all purposes. He has also not responded to the respondent's motion to dismiss, even though his response was due on or before November 14, 2017. The Court recognizes that Petitioner has been moved several times. Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk to resend to Petitioner at his current location at the Suffolk County House of Corrections the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge and the respondent's motion to dismiss. No later than December 29, 2017, Nhim shall file (1) the appropriate form indicating whether or not he consents to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge for all purposes and (2) his response to respondent's motion to dismiss. (York, Steve) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 11/28 2:53 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Thomas M. Hodgson.(Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/28 2:50 PM
STATUS REPORT by Thomas M. Hodgson. (Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 11/14 2:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. No later than November 28, 2017, the government shall file a status report regarding whether the petitioner has been returned to Massachusetts and, if so, the address where he is currently located. (York, Steve) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 10/31 11:21 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas M. Hodgson.(Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 10/31 11:18 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas M. Hodgson.(Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 10/18 2:33 PM
Consent by Thomas M. Hodgson to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge.(York, Steve) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 10/12 4:41 PM
NOTICE by Thomas M. Hodgson re4 Service Order - 2241 Petition,,,,, Government's Notice of Temporary Transfer From Massachusetts(Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Assistant Field Office Director Anthony Ciulla, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Service Email | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/12 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elianna J. Nuzum on behalf of Thomas M. Hodgson (Nuzum, Elianna) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee/Payment Received
Thu 10/12 3:44 PM
Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST064860 for1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Service Order-2241 Petition
Tue 10/10 4:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later than 21 days from receipt of this order. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. Any such 48-hour notice period shall commence at the date and time such notice is filed and expire 48 hours later, except "[i]f the period would end on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, the period continues to run until the same time on the next day that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday." Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(2)(C). [On October 10, 2017, the clerk (i) emailed copies of this order, the petition and consent forms to a paralegal within the Office of the U.S. Attorney for the D. Mass; (ii) served copies of same, by first class mail, to respondent; (iii) sent copies of order and consent form to petitioner by first class mail at address on docket; and (iv) served copies of petition, order and consent form to U.S. Attorney by placing in mailbox for US Atty in Clerk's Office for pick-up.](PSSA, 4) |
|
Att: 1 consent package | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Tue 10/10 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 10/10 12:37 PM
NOTICE: Fee paid by Nhoueth Nhim. (Franklin, Yvonne) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241
Tue 10/10 12:30 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Nhoueth Nhim.(Franklin, Yvonne) |