Rist et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02783 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 08, 2018 4:56 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah J Rist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Rist
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/03 11:59 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Teresa L. Bowers, Erica Lynn White, Kenneth W. White, Lisa Y Knight, Jane P. Stone, Robert M. Stone, Philip Gatch, Kara L. Kelly, Cheryl Montgomery, Gregory Montgomery, Elizabeth Rene Russell, Gary Allen Russell, James R. Dalby, Peggy R. Dalby, Ronald A. Finch, Susan M. Finch, Christine L. Weeks, Daniel J Weeks, Roberta Milano, Frederick Warren Reynolds, Elizabeth Adams, Robert Charles Adams, Jr, Duane Harper, Michelle Shennice Harper, Kenneth L Barun, Sethea G Barun, Donna B. Burford, Linda C. O'Shea, Brian Deneault, Irene Deneault, Myrtle Julie Lovelace Oliver, Kathleen Ballenger, Ralph Ballenger, Carol A. Hardy, George E. Hardy, Herbert Charles Chancellor, Marieke Chancellor, Dean J. Konley, Virginia Konley, Raynard Lee Brown, Virginia Wright, Deborah J Rist, Steven Rist, Mary E. Porter, Beth A Fouts, Jon W Fouts, Brenda C. Chaffin, Wray W Chaffin, Gayle Cuneo, Joseph Cuneo, Marjorie M. Krasnodemski, Edward Krasnodemski, Jr., Michael Joseph Howard, Pamela Karen Benton Howard, Daniel R Brady, Robyn Brady, Donald Dee Rundle, Theresa A Rundle, Karen M. Ragosta, Robert A Ragosta, Richard F Worley, Mark G Doyle, Duane Smith, Emily J. Madison, Catherine M. Orange, Roland Lionel Boisvert, Pamela Schuerman, Ronald Schuerman, Janet Leigh Dowdy, Charles K. Gourley, Karen S. Gourley, Jaen Sidney, Diane J. Lord, Jerald F. Lord, Daniel C Sirois, Jennifer A Sirois, Harriet Granoff, Lloyd Granoff, Andrienne R Ervin, Jennifer Lacey, Dusty A. Gillin, Timothy J. Gillin, Donald J. Woodruff, Terese Woodruff, Barbara O. Johnson, Donald R. Johnson, Joe Ann McGahee, Phillip W McGahee, III, Janeen Tolmachoff, Mitchell Tolmachoff, Gail M. Johnson, Sheryl Bostic, Richard A. Flint, Donna J. Forest, Marilyn Christine Little, Donna Lynn Thompson, Jude T Thompson, Anthony Lima, Jr, Bennett F. Miller, Jr., Carol LaRivierre, Eric C. LaRivierre, James H MacLean, Patricia Lee MacLean, Erika A. Damico, James G. Damico, Linda Lucas Perry, Joseph Barth, Ellen H. Pace, Robert Anthony Pace, Talmage L. Person, Judith Hammond, Dianna Weideman, James P. Weideman, Joyce L. Cagnon, Roland N. Cagnon, Helen A. Scruggs. (Duane, John) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 02/03 2:27 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/10 2:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deborah J Rist, Steven Rist. (Duane, John) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/10 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Deborah J Rist, Steven Rist (Duane, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc filed by Deborah J Rist, Steven Rist. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8727565) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Duane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |