Marminco III Family, L.P. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen Cardone |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00311 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 08, 2018 4:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Arch Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Betts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marminco III Family, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerk's Copy
Mon 01/22 5:11 PM
Remand delivered to District clerks office for County Court at Law No.6 of El Paso County, Texas. (dc) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 12/19 3:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Remand to State Court Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 11/29 5:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Marminco III Family, L.P., re2 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Marminco III Family, L.P. (Allan, William) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Advisory to the Court
Wed 11/22 2:49 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Marminco III Family, L.P.. (Allan, William) |
|
3 | 3
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/22 1:27 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, re2 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Marminco III Family, L.P. (Cummings, Kristin) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 11/10 6:11 PM
Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Marminco III Family, L.P..(Allan, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Wed 10/11 12:42 PM
Remark : All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Kathleen Cardone located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (mn) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 10/10 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-10058905), filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Cummings, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Citations, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 10/11 12:10 PM
Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ec) |
||
misc
To be Referred to EP Mag Judge
Wed 10/11 12:11 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (ec) |