State of New York v. Mountain Tobacco Company
Original Case: 2:12-cv-06276
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03198 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2019 3:29 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Congress of American Indians
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mountain Tobacco Distributing Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Delbert Wheeler, Sr.
|
|
Defendant - Appellant-Cross-Appellee
Mountain Tobacco Company, DBA King Mountain Tobacco Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee-Cross-Appellant
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 07 2019
OPINION, reversing in part, affirming in part and remanding the case to the district court, by ALK, DJ, RDS, FILED.[2700498] [17-3198, 17-3222] |
Docket last updated: 11/09/2019 3:28 AM EST |
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mountain Tobacco Company, FILED. [2142377] 17-3198 [Entered: 10/06/2017 01:56 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 117 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2142381] 17-3198 [Entered: 10/06/2017 01:58 PM] | |
3 | 3 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 07/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2142382] 17-3198 [Entered: 10/06/2017 01:59 PM] | |
4 | 4 28 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 08/29/2017, RECEIVED.[2142384] 17-3198 [Entered: 10/06/2017 01:59 PM] | |
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Mountain Tobacco Company, district court receipt # 0207-9883664, FILED.[2142385] 17-3198 [Entered: 10/06/2017 02:00 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2142386] 17-3198 [Entered: 10/06/2017 02:00 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |