THORNTON v. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Karen M Williams |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-08107 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Apr 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 09, 2018 5:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAMERON THORNTON
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Terminated: 12/20/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Terminated: 11/02/2017
|
|
Defendant
TRANS UNION, LLC
Terminated: 01/09/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 04/02 4:19 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/2/18. (ar1, ) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/05 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CAMERON THORNTON (REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 01/31 8:01 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/31/18. (ar1, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 01/30 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to all Remaining Parties by CAMERON THORNTON (REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Wed 01/17 5:06 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by CAMERON THORNTON.(REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 01/09 3:14 PM
ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff and Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC Only. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/9/2018. (dmr) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 01/08 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only by TRANS UNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 12/20 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Capital One Only by CAMERON THORNTON (REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/07 3:56 PM
ORDER that the time for Capital One to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint in this action is hereby extended through and including December 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/7/2017. (rtm, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 12/06 5:26 PM
Letter from Philip A. Goldstein to the Hon. Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J. re: extension of time for Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. to respond to the Complaint re1 Complaint,.(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation extending time for Capital One to respond to the Complaint | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 11/28 10:28 AM
TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated November 27, 2017 from Dorothy A. Kowal, Esquire, counsel for defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for January 10, 2018, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is January 31, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/28/17. (Ramos, Nicole) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Mon 11/27 2:37 PM
Letter from Dorothy Kowal re16 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (KOWAL, DOROTHY) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 11/22 2:23 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by 12/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/22/2017. (dmr) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Tue 11/21 3:06 PM
Letter from Philip A. Goldstein to the Hon. Renee Marie Bumb re: Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint.(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP) |
|
Att: 1 [Proposed] Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/14 2:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(KOWAL, DOROTHY) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
6
pgs
order
Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)
Mon 11/06 10:12 AM
Amended Order Initial Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/6/2017. (nz) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
6
pgs
order
Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)
Fri 11/03 9:48 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 1/18/2018 at 9:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/3/2017. (dmr) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 11/02 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by CAMERON THORNTON (REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 11/01 2:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by 11/24/2017. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/1/2017. (dmr) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/01 1:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 10/31 2:06 PM
Letter from Philip A. Goldstein re extending the time for Capital One to respond to the Complaint.(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Extending Time To Respond To The Complaint | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/31 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/20 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAMERON THORNTON. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 10/12/2017, answer due 11/2/2017. (REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 10/20 9:24 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/16/2017. (dmr) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 10/19 5:14 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (KOWAL, DOROTHY) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/19 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DOROTHY A. KOWAL on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/19 5:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/17 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAMERON THORNTON. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 10/12/2017, answer due 11/2/2017. (REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/16 4:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion as Corporate Parent.. (BROWN, WILLIAM) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/16 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN on behalf of TRANS UNION, LLC (BROWN, WILLIAM) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/11 11:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/11 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8149288) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CAMERON THORNTON.(REZNIK, MAKSIM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Payment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit August 2017 Credit Report, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Dispute Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit October 2017 Credit Report, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 10/11 11:32 AM
Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Wed 10/11 11:40 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jbk, ) |