Castro v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Eileen S Willett |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03633 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security Administration
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Office of General Counsel
|
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Castro
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 12/12 8:27 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the29 Motion for Award of Attorney Fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding Plaintiff attorney's fees in the amount of $26,668.75. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall, after receipt of the above-awarded fee, refund to Plaintiff the lesser of the fee awarded under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) and any fees awarded under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/11/19. (MSA) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Memorandum
Tue 12/10 8:42 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of 29 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) by Plaintiff Veronica Castro.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Social Security Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Client Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Itemization of Services | ||
29 | 29
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 12/10 8:40 AM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) by Veronica Castro.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 04/17 11:47 AM
ORDER granting27 Stipulation for Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/17/19. (MSA) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/16 9:44 AM
STIPULATION Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Veronica Castro.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 01/31 12:51 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed January 31, 2019, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for an immediate award of benefits effective October 1, 2010. This matter is hereby terminated. (LAD) |
|
25 | 25
12
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/31 12:48 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED reversing the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security and remanding this case to the Commissioner for an immediate award of benefits effective October 1, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. )See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/31/19. (LAD) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Brief - Reply
Thu 06/07 2:32 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Veronica Castro . (Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Brief - Response
Thu 05/24 4:57 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration re19 Brief - Opening . (Becia, Franco) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 03/30 4:13 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief no later than May 25, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 03/30/2018. (KAS) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Declaration
Fri 03/30 2:15 PM
DECLARATION of Franco L. Becia re:20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Becia, Franco) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 03/30 2:11 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Becia, Franco) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief - Opening
Thu 03/08 12:59 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Veronica Castro (Submitted by Mark Caldwell).(KAS) |
|
Att: 1 Glossary | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Thu 03/08 12:58 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may file her opening brief which exceeds the page limitation by threepages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 03/08/2018. (KAS) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Lodged Proposed Document
Tue 03/06 7:52 AM
LODGED Proposed Opening Brief re:16 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Opening Brief . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Veronica Castro.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Glossary | ||
16 | 16
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 03/06 7:49 AM
First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Opening Brief by Veronica Castro.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING PERMISSION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR OPENING BRIEF FOR PLAINTIFF | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript
Fri 01/05 7:56 AM
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Becia, Franco) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 008 Disability Related Development Part 2, | ||
Att: 9 009 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 10 010 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 11 011 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 12 012 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 13 013 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 14 014 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 15 015 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 16 016 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 17 017 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 18 018 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 19 019 Medical Records Part 11, | ||
Att: 20 020 Medical Records Part 12, | ||
Att: 21 021 Medical Records Part 13 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/05 7:44 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Becia, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Tue 01/02 11:15 AM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Tue 01/02 11:13 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
Fri 12/29 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Franco L. Becia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Becia, Franco) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 10/23 8:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/20 12:14 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service by waiver or of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendants by the U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The parties must fully comply with LRCiv 16.1 in its entirety. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/20/2017.(KAS) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 10/16 11:19 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Wed 10/11 2:09 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. ORDERED that this case be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett, United States Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 17-03633 PHX-ESW. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/11/17.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
misc
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline
Wed 10/11 2:10 PM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 10/11 11:01 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-03633 PHX-SPL. Magistrate Election form attached. (REK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 10/11 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Veronica Castro. (submitted by Mark Caldwell) (REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 10/11 10:57 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Veronica Castro. (submitted by Mark Caldwell) (REK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/11 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Veronica Castro. (submitted by Mark Caldwell) (REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |