Byirt v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03716 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 10, 2018 1:33 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James D Byirt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
11
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Mon 04/26 12:37 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The cases listed on Attachment B (see Doc. 22012-1) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
11
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 04/22 12:44 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. (2) The cases listed on Attachment B (see Doc. 22012-1) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
10
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 11/21 7:03 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20896 in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/19. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 10/12 12:37 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 17-03716 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/12 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14750282 filed by James D Byirt.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |