73
|
|
73
order
Motion, Stay Order
Fri 03/02 11:00 AM
Order signed on 3/2/2018 Denying Motion to Stay Order pending Appeal. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
|
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 03/02 11:03 AM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
|
74
|
|
74
40
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 03/02 11:09 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 02/22/2018 RE: TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL; OPPOSITION OF ROSEMARIE A. HERMAN TO DEBTOR'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL FILED BY JEFFREY H. SCHWARTZ ON BEHALF OF ROSEMARIE A. HERMAN.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/30/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/8/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/2/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/30/2018. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
|
72
|
|
72
11
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 03/02 10:54 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 02/13/2018 RE: TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION TO DISMISS; OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS CHAPTER 11 CASE; DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. RATTET IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RETENTION AS ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR, AND IN OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS UNDER FED. R. BANK. P. 9011; SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF DEBTOR IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS; REPLY TO MOTION BY ROSEMARIE A. HERMAN (I) TO DISMISS THIS CASE AS A BAD FAITH FILING, (II) TO REMAND THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO STATE COURT, AND (III) FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEBTORS PRINCIPAL AND DEBTORS COUNSEL; REPLY TO MOTION DECLARATION;. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/30/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/8/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/2/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/30/2018. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
|
71
|
|
71
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Endorsed Order
Thu 03/01 3:54 PM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 3/1/2018. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
|
70
|
|
70
1
pgs
order
Order of U.S. District Court Judge
Thu 03/01 12:52 PM
Order of U.S. District Court Judge Ronnie Abrams, signed on 2/28/2018. Related [+] Stipulation Dismissing Appeal With Prejudice. (Petitti, Andrea)
|
69
|
|
69
ans
Response
Tue 02/27 3:09 PM
Response to Letter Dated February 26, 2018 filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz on behalf of Rosemarie A. Herman. (Schwartz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Transcript
|
68
|
|
68
misc
Letter
Tue 02/27 2:29 PM
Letter Addressing Payment of Property Taxes Using Moneys in D.I.P. Account Related [+] Filed by Robert Leslie Rattet on behalf of Windsor Plaza LLC. (Rattet, Robert)
|