Hawaii Island Air, Inc.
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-01078 |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Converted: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hawaii Island Air, Inc.
550 Paiea St
Honolulu, HI 96819-1856 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
3rd Pty Defendant
Duane Kurisu
1000 Bishop Street Suite 202
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
3rd Pty Defendant
AIO, LLC
1000 Bishop Street Suite 202
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
3rd Pty Defendant
David Uchiyama
500 Ala Moana Blvd. 4 WATERFRONT PLZ STE 480
HONOLULU, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Elizabeth A Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee.
1132 Bishop Street, Suite 602
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 12 2022
Order Regarding Confidential Designation of Certain Documents (Related Doc # 1099) Date of Entry: 9/12/2022. (LL) |
1. | Hawaii's Island Air Files for Bankruptcy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/17/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 02/07/2022 5:32 AM HST |
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/16 1:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-01078 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt No. 2416672. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 10/16 1:55 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Without All Required Schedules/Statements. Deadlines: Government Proofs of Claim generally due by 4/16/2018. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due 10/30/2017. Schedule A-J due 10/30/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/30/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/30/2017.Incomplete Filings due by 10/30/2017. (Pettit, Ted) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Mon 10/16 2:01 PM
Corporate Resolution . Filed by Ted N. Pettit on behalf of Hawaii Island Air, Inc. dba Island Air. (Pettit, Ted) |
|
3 | 3
misc
miscellaneous document
Mon 10/16 2:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement of Hawaii Island Air, Inc. . Filed by Ted N. Pettit on behalf of Hawaii Island Air, Inc. dba Island Air. (Pettit, Ted) |
|
4 | 4
order
BNC Order to File Documents and Notice of Intent to Dismiss [Intake or C/A]
Mon 10/16 2:52 PM
Order to File Documents and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case (BNC Transmittal) Date of Entry: 10/16/2017. (JN) |
|
5 | 5
motion
motion
Mon 10/16 5:27 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Hearing on "First Day" Motions and Application . Filed by Ted N. Pettit on behalf of Hawaii Island Air, Inc.. (Pettit, Ted). **Modified on 10/17/2017 [Clerk's Note: Added relation to document nos.6 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,11 .]**(JN) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Ted N. Pettit; Exhibit A |