Roy v. Unnamed Defendant
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Vining, Jr |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00125 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 06, 2014 4:48 PM EST |
Defendant
Unnamed Defendant
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Jessica Roy
2521 Bradford Square NE
Atlanta, GA 30345 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, March 10, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (jpa)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- | |
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Jessica Roy re7 Clerk's Judgment and6 Order to Dismiss (jpa) | ||
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Order to Dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to comply with a court order. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 3/6/14. (jpa) | |
Civil Case Terminated. (jpa) | ||
Tuesday, February 25, 2014 | ||
Submission of5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Discovery, submitted to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (jta) | ||
Thursday, February 20, 2014 | ||
Submission of4 Order, submitted to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (jta) | ||
Tuesday, February 04, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Discovery by Kimberly Jessica Roy. (bdb) | |
Monday, January 27, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER directing the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 20 days. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 1/27/14. (jpa) | |
Friday, January 17, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 COMPLAINT filed by Kimberly Jessica Roy.(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 ORDER GRANTING1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refrain from forwarding the Complaint to the UnitedStates Marshals Service for service until the District Judge orders otherwise.Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/17/14. (jta) | |
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Jessica Roy re2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jta) | ||
Submission of3 Complaint for a frivolity determination (as directed in2 Order), submitted to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (jta) | ||
Thursday, January 16, 2014 | ||
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (eop) | ||
Wednesday, January 15, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kimberly Jessica Roy.(eop) | |
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |