Gray v. Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company et al
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John W Degravelles |
Referred: | Richard L Bourgeois, Jr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01126 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 14, 2018 4:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tommy Manning
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TLM2 Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Gray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago |
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/04 8:12 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 5/4/2018. (SWE) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/4/2018) (SWE) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/03 10:20 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Tommy Manning, TLM2 Enterprises, Inc.(Luminais, Bradley) Modified to edit text on 5/3/2018 (SGO) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Order of dismissal | ||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
60 Day Order of Dismissal
Tue 04/10 10:42 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 4/10/2018. (SWE) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 04/10 10:40 AM
Letter dated 4/10/2018 from Bradley J. Luminais, Jr. to Judge deGravelles Re: Settlement. (SWE) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/06 1:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In view of the reassignment of the district judge, the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter are set forth herein. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Discovery due by 7/23/2018. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/23/2018. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/6/2018. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/22/2018. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 11/5/2018. Discovery from Experts due by 12/5/2018. Motions shall be filed by 1/7/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 5/27/2019. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 6/17/2019. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 7/5/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2019 - 7/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/6/2018. (SGO) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case to Judge John W. deGravelles from Judge James J. Brady
Fri 01/05 3:42 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2017-11, this case is reassigned from Judge James J. Brady to Judge John E. deGravelles. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/20 11:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2018. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 12/27/2017. Discovery due by 7/23/2018. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/23/2018. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/6/2018. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/22/2018. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 11/5/2018. Discovery from Experts due by 12/5/2018. Motions shall be filed by 1/7/2019. The remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter will be set upon the reassignment of the district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/20/2017. (JSL) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel
Tue 12/12 2:43 PM
Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CANCELLED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Wed 12/06 5:12 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Alaina E. Brandhurst with Morris Bart, LLC is withdrawn as counsel of record and K. Luke Williamson is substituted as counsel of record for the plaintiff, Monica Gray, in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/6/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 12/05 9:38 AM
MOTION to Substitute K. Luke Williamson in place of Alaina E. Brandhurst as Attorney by Monica Gray.(Williamson, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Tue 12/05 10:36 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:5 MOTION to Substitute K. Luke Williamson in place of Alaina E. Brandhurst as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/28 12:36 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Tommy Manning, TLM2 Enterprises, Inc.. (Blackburn, Heather) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
90 Day Conference Order
Thu 11/02 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/2/2017. (JSL) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/18 4:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Tommy Manning, TLM2 Enterprises, Inc..(Luminais, Bradley) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
Mon 10/16 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge, Case Number 661044. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1655192), filed by Tommy Manning, TLM2 Enterprises, Inc., Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company.(Luminais, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Complaint for Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Pleading; List of Attorneys in State Court Action, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment Notice of Compliance with Removal Order, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment State Court Record |