CM EBAR, LLC
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | August B Landis |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-15530 |
Case Filed: | Oct 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Feb 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CM EBAR, LLC
PO Box 189
Bedford Hills Bedford Hills, NY 10507-0189 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |