The People of the State of California v. BP P.L.C. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-06011 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Aug 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 18, 2018 2:09 AM PDT |
3rd party defendant
Statoil ASA
|
|
3rd party plaintiff
Chevron Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Concerned Household Electricity Consumers Council
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Viscount Christopher Monckton
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Indiana
Office of the Indiana Attorney General Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl. 302 W. Washington Indianapolis
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
BP P.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ConocoPhillips Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Exxon Mobil Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Royal Dutch Shell PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ConocoPhillips
|
|
Movant
William Happer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
1. | Judge dismisses climate-change lawsuit against 5 oil giants (marketwatch.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/26/2018 | |
2. | Climate Change Lawsuit Sets Dangerous Precedent (realclearenergy.org) |
Submitted Mon 06/04/2018 | |
3. | Inside the climate change lawsuit pitting Big Oil against San Francisco and Oakland (theverge.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/29/2018 | |
4. | Chevron Says Climate Change Lawsuit `Not Viable' As It Prepares To Educate Judge On Science (forbes.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/21/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
445 | 445
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 02/16 10:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding case to Superior Court of the State of California County of Alameda. Per Order at Docket no.434 . (anj, COURT STAFF) |