Reed v. GOHEALTH URGENT CARE et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eric N Vitaliano |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-06245 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 23, 2018 6:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Susan Finnelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angelica Shapiro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GoHealth Urgent Care
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erica Orientale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lyanne Reed
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/25 4:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, That this action be and is hereby dismissed, in its entirety, and with prejudice, and with no award of attorneys' fees, costs and/or disbursements to any party. The Clerk is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/24/2018) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/18 3:45 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stip and Ordr of Dismsl w Prejudice by Susan Finnelly, Erica Orientale, Angelica Shapiro, True North Urgent Care, LLC (Courtian, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 07/16 4:08 PM
ORDER: Terminating19 Motion to Adjourn Conference. See Order dated June 8, 2018, adjourning the status conference to October 10, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/16/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Fri 07/13 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm, Address, Email Address by Kevin Richard Miller (Miller, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 07/12 4:41 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference (July 13, 2018 Status Conference) by Susan Finnelly, Erica Orientale, Angelica Shapiro, True North Urgent Care, LLC. (Miller, Kevin) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 06/08 9:22 AM
ORDER: Granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery is extended to September 18, 2018. The status conference previously scheduled for July 13, 2018 is adjourned to October 10, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/8/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 06/07 11:01 AM
Letter : JOINT LETTER REQUESTING 90-DAY EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Susan Finnelly, Erica Orientale, Angelica Shapiro, True North Urgent Care, LLC (Courtian, Jennifer) Modified to add motion on 6/7/2018 (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/18 11:34 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING NAME OF DEFENDANT by Susan Finnelly, GoHealth Urgent Care, Erica Orientale, Angelica Shapiro (Courtian, Jennifer) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 05/18 12:28 PM
ORDER: Application to Substitute Name of Defendant17 is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/18/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/24 1:52 PM
Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 1/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. White for plaintiff, Courtian for defendants. Fact discovery will be completed by June 20, 2018. The parties do not anticipate the need for experts. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FURTHER CONFERENCE AT 2:00 PM ON JULY 13, 2018. The parties shall be prepared (1) to state their respective positions on settlement, with principals WITH FULL SETTLEMENT DECISION-MAKING AUTHORITY (UP TO THE AMOUNT LAST DEMANDED FOR DEFENDANTS, DOWN TO THE AMOUNT LAST OFFERED FOR PLAINTIFFS) PRESENT OR AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE THROUGHOUT THE CONFERENCE, (2) to articulate the basis for any anticipated summary judgment motions and to be familiar with any premotion conference procedures required by the district judge presiding over the case, and (3) to state whether they will agree to assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes, including jury trial and entry of final judgment. Counsel are encouraged to file a written application requesting a settlement conference, or a referral to court-annexed mediation, on an earlier date if they believe it might be productive to do so. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/19 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Richard Miller on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Miller, Kevin) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/19 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Beth Courtian on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Courtian, Jennifer) |
|
13 | 13
13
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/19 4:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Courtian, Jennifer) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/19 4:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Susan Finnelly, GoHealth Urgent Care, Erica Orientale, Angelica Shapiro (Courtian, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/12 6:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on January 24, 2018 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/12/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Att: 1 Chambers Individual Rules | ||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 12/11 4:33 PM
ORDER granting, upon consent of the plaintiff,10 Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/11/2017. (Mejia, Benjamin) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 12/08 5:59 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Susan Finnelly, GoHealth Urgent Care, Erica Orientale, Angelica Shapiro. (Courtian, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 10/26 10:25 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 10/26 10:24 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/26 10:23 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/25 9:14 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Lyanne Reed (White, Norman) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/25 9:13 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Lyanne Reed (White, Norman) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/25 9:12 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Lyanne Reed (White, Norman) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/25 9:11 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Lyanne Reed (White, Norman) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/25 8:47 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Lyanne Reed (White, Norman) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/25 8:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Susan Finnelly, GOHEALTH URGENT CARE, Angelica Shapiro, erica orientale filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9931926 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Lyanne Reed. (White, Norman) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Right to Sue letter issued by the EEOC | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 10/26 10:19 AM
Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |