Elderhome Land, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Wendelin I Lipp |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-24324 |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Thomas Norris, Debtor
Elderhome Land, LLC 15623 Riding Stable Road
Laurel, MD 20707 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/01 12:14 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Alexander, Lisa) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Line
Mon 11/20 3:41 PM
Line re Compliance with Order Directing Debtor's Counsel to Refund all Fees on behalf of Elderhome Land, LLC Filed by A. Donald C Discepolo . (Discepolo, A. Donald) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 11/18 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 11/15 1:22 PM
Order Directing Debtor's Counsel to Refund All Fees RE:8 Order Directing Debtor(s) Counsel to Comply. (Alexander, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/03 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/03 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/03 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 10/31 8:28 AM
Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Comply with Local Bankruptcy Rule 1002-1. (Alexander, Lisa) |
|
8 | 8
order
Directing Debtor(s) Counsel to Comply
Tue 10/31 8:26 AM
Order Directing Debtor(s) Counsel to Comply with Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1(b) RE:1 Voluntary Petition. (Alexander, Lisa) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 10/30 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Barnhill, Leander) |
|
Sunday, October 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 10/30 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 10/30 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 10/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/27 3:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Eagle Commercial Ventures, LLC. (Smith, Benjamin) |
|
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 10/27 3:30 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 10/26 4:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-24324 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 31551002. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 10/26 4:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Elderhome Land, LLC. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Thomas Norris. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity (Small Business) expires 04/24/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/24/2018. Schedules A-H due 11/9/2017. Schedules A/B-J due 11/9/2017. Schedule A due 11/9/2017. Schedule B due 11/9/2017. Schedule A/B due 11/9/2017. Schedule C due 11/9/2017. Schedule D due 11/9/2017. Schedule E due 11/9/2017. Schedule F due 11/9/2017. Schedule E/F due 11/9/2017. Schedule G due 11/9/2017. Schedule H due 11/9/2017. Schedule I due 11/9/2017. Schedule J due 11/9/2017. Schedule J-2 due 11/9/2017. Declaration for Schedules due 11/9/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/9/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/9/2017. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B due 11/9/2017.Balance Sheet Due 11/9/2017.Statement of Operations due 11/9/2017.Cash Flow Statement due 11/9/2017.Federal Income Tax Return date: 11/9/2017. Attorney Signature due by 11/9/2017. Social Security Number Verification Page due by 11/9/2017. Creditor Mailing Matrix Verification due by 11/9/2017. Credit Counseling Certificate due 11/9/2017. Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment due 11/9/2017. Incomplete Filings due 11/9/2017 (Discepolo, A. Donald) |