WANT v. THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Ann Marie Donio |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-09343 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 23, 2018 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION
|
|
Plaintiff
JEROME WANT
1684 LANGLEY DR #105
HAGERSTOWN, MD 21740 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/12 4:09 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ar1, ) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 02/15 11:53 AM
TEXT ORDER. THIS MATTER comes before the Court upon the filing of a "Notice to Withdraw this Case from this Jurisdiction" [Dkt. No. 7] by Plaintiff Jerome Want in which Plaintiff indicates his intention to withdraw his Complaint, without prejudice. The Court construes Plaintiff's notice as a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court shall REOPEN this matter on the Court's active docket, and this matter shall be DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/15/2018. (Bumb, Renee) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/15 11:07 AM
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW THIS CASE FROM THIS JURISDICTION by JEROME WANT. (js) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/25 3:43 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall cease and desist from having any further telephonic communications with the Clerk of Court or the Court's Chambers, absent a true emergency; Plaintiff shall submit to this Court a letter indicating that he will refrain from having any further telephonic communications with Court personnel, absent a true emergency. Plaintiff shall also file a letter and/or short brief indicating why venue is proper in this district. The Court shall administratively terminate this matter. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/26/2018. (tf, n.m.) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/25 3:44 PM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (tf, ) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 01/24 2:49 PM
Letter from JEROME WANT addressed to Judge Bumb; re: Service of Complaint. (tf, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/28 3:07 PM
ORDER Plaintiff's IFP is Granted. Directing Clerk to file the Complaint. Ordered no summons shall issue until the Complaint is screened by the Court. Ordered the Motion to Recuse3 is Denied because it is frivolous. nm 11/28. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/28/17. (jbk, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Application/Petition
Tue 11/28 11:28 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION to recuse by JEROME WANT. (tf, ) |
|
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/28 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT1 against THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, filed by JEROME WANT.(jbk, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 11/15 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by JEROME WANT (jbk, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Thu 10/26 2:26 PM
Complaint Received.(jbk, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Application IFP, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order |