Cruz v. Union Independiente Autentica de Empleados de la Autoridad de Acueductos y Alcantarillados (UIA) et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Pedro A Delgado-Hernande |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02261 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 24, 2018 5:12 AM AST |
Cross Claimant
Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Union Independiente Autentica de Empleados de la Autoridad de Acueductos y Alcantarillados (UIA)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Union Independiente Autentica de Empleados de la Autoridad de Acueductos y Alcantarillados (UIA)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ricardo Rossello-Nevares
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reynaldo Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
248 | 248
respm
Reply to Motion
Tue 12/19 5:59 PM
REPLY to Motion filed by Reynaldo Cruz Re:235 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Reynaldo Cruz filed by Reynaldo Cruz. (Gilliam, Matthew) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
247 | 247
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 12/15 2:36 PM
ORDER: Granting246 "Plaintiff Reynaldo Cruz's Local Civil Rule 7(c) Motion for Leave to File Reply." Reply due December 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/15/2023. (FAR) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
246 | 246
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 12/14 3:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Matthew B. Gilliam on behalf of Reynaldo Cruz Responses due by 12/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gilliam, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
245 | 245
motion
In Compliance
Tue 12/12 7:11 PM
Motion In Compliance as to237 Order, 242 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of Union Independiente Autentica de Empleados de la Autoridad de Acueductos y Alcantarillados (UIA) Responses due by 12/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose) |
|
244 | 244
motion
In Compliance
Tue 12/12 6:31 PM
Motion In Compliance with Order filed by Erika Berrios-Berrios on behalf of Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority Responses due by 12/26/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Berrios-Berrios, Erika) |