SWEIGERT et al v. PEREZ et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02223 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 24, 2018 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
RAO ABBAS
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY WEINER
|
|
Defendant
DEBORAH WASSERMAN-SCHULTZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATALIA SOVA
|
|
Defendant
HASEEB RANA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TOM PEREZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THERESA GRAFENSTINE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DNC SERVICES CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAMAL AWAN
|
|
Defendant
IMRAN AWAN
|
|
Defendant
ABID AWAN
|
|
Defendant
HINA ALVI
|
|
Defendant
HUMA ABEDIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOES 1 TO 435
|
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT
8850 Hampton Mall Drive N.
Capitol Heights, MD 20743 |
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DOES 1 TO 435
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Podesta Group
Terminated: 12/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 20 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 17 19 20 22 26 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 20, 2018. (lcrc2) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 10/02 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THERESA GRAFENSTINE. Attorney Sarah Edith Clouse terminated. (Clouse, Sarah) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/02 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J. Marple on behalf of THERESA GRAFENSTINE (Marple, Pamela) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 09/20 4:11 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting17 19 20 22 26 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 20, 2018. (lcrc2) |
|
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 09/20 4:09 PM
ORDER granting17 19 20 22 26 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 20, 2018. (lcrc2) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/12 5:24 PM
NOTICE by DEBORAH WASSERMAN-SCHULTZ re20 MOTION to Dismiss (Pittard, William) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/12 4:42 PM
NOTICE by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, TOM PEREZ re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Spiva, Bruce) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
.Order
Mon 01/08 4:28 PM
FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by February 5, 2018, to Defendant Huma Abedin's motion to dismiss or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 8, 2018. (lcrc2) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Fri 01/05 1:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by HUMA ABEDIN(Dunn, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Abedin Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 12/29 12:18 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re22 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by THERESA GRAFENSTINE. (Clouse, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
.Order
Wed 12/27 2:25 PM
FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by February 5, 2018, to Defendants' motions to dismiss or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 27, 2017. (lcrc2) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 12/27 2:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/5/2018. (tj) |
||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 12/28 9:50 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re22 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT. (zjf) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss Case as Frivolous
Wed 12/20 4:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by THERESA GRAFENSTINE(Clouse, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/20 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of THERESA GRAFENSTINE (Clouse, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss
Tue 12/19 6:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by DEBORAH WASSERMAN-SCHULTZ (Pittard, William) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Tue 12/19 1:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, TOM PEREZ(Spiva, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshall, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshall, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshall, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 10:45 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Cone on behalf of Podesta Group (Cone, Timothy) Modified on 12/19/2017 (jf) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
Tue 12/19 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re18 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in the correct case 17cv2330 . (jf) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Mon 12/18 10:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by HASEEB RANA (Winograd, Jesse) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 12/15 9:57 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to George W. Sweigert, 8550 Hampton Mall Drive N, Capitol Heights, MD 20743; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order dated 11/20/17; (No forwarding address provided) (tj) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/14 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Dunn on behalf of HUMA ABEDIN (Dunn, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 12/13 10:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Huma Abedin shall have up to and including January 5, 2018 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 13, 2017. (lcrc2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 12/13 4:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/5/2018, (tj) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 12/12 2:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by HUMA ABEDIN (Goodman, Martha) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 11/29 11:21 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by HASEEB RANA (Winograd, Jesse) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/29 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Isaac Winograd on behalf of HASEEB RANA (Winograd, Jesse) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 11/29 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Rana shall have up to and including December 19, 2017 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 29, 2017. (lcrc2) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 11/29 11:55 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT. (jf) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/27 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Position by DEBORAH WASSERMAN-SCHULTZ (Pittard, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 11/27 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of9 Defendant Wasserman Schultz's Motion for Extension of Time and10 Notice of Plaintiff's opposition to the extension, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant Wasserman Schultz shall have up to and including December 19, 2017 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 27, 2017. (lcrc2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/27 4:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/19/2017. (tj) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 11/22 4:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEBORAH WASSERMAN-SCHULTZ (Pittard, William) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/22 11:54 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/19/2017, (tj) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/20 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Position by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, TOM PEREZ re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Spiva, Bruce) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 11/20 4:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Tom Perez and DNC Services Corporation shall have up to and including December 19, 2017 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 20, 2017. (lcrc2) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Tue 11/21 9:34 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HASEEB RANA served on 11/10/2017, answer due 12/1/2017 (jf) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 11/20 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT (jf) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 11/17 5:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, TOM PEREZ(Spiva, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Related Case
Fri 11/17 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, TOM PEREZ. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-02330. (Spiva, Bruce) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 11/13 3:02 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted (according to USPS Tracking) by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT as to HUMA ABEDIN, ANTHONY WEINER. (td) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Mon 11/13 3:00 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TOM PEREZ served on 10/31/2017, answer due 11/21/2017 (td) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/27 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616087836) with Jury Demand filed by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT.(jf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/27 1:47 PM
Summons (12) Issued as to All Defendants. (jf) |