Calmese v. Under Armour Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03955 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 24, 2018 2:32 AM MST |
Defendant
Under Armour Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael D Calmese
a resident of Arizona 3046 N 32nd St., Unit # 321
Phoenix, AZ 85018 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
67 | 67
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/20 3:00 PM
ORDER granting the parties'66 Stipulation of Dismissal; this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Any pending motions are terminated as moot; each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; and the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/20/2018. (ATD) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
66 | 66
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/15 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Michael D Calmese. (Jones, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
65 | 65
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 08/14 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Christensen Jones on behalf of Michael D Calmese. (Jones, Jacob) |