Cumis Insurance Society, Inc. v. Vallatini
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00538 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 24, 2018 10:45 PM HST |
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Government Agencies 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Partnerships 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Vallatini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cumis Insurance Society, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
CUNA Mutual Group
Terminated: 11/06/2017
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 16 2018
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III re 30 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/16/2018. (emt, ) |
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
59 | 59
order
Stipulation for Dismissal and Order
Mon 10/21 4:37 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Cumis Insurance Society, Inc. - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/21/2019. This action is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the applicable Local Rules. There are no remaining claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third partyclaims between the parties. (emt, ) |
|
misc
Advisory Entry
Mon 10/21 9:00 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number58 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Cumis Insurance Society, Inc., shall be submitted for consideration to Judge Derrick K. Watson at watson_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may refer to the CM/ECF Guide, specifically, 10.3 Submission of Proposed Orders and 10.4 Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers. (emt, ) |
||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
58 | 58
misc
Stipulation
Fri 10/18 11:00 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Cumis Insurance Society, Inc.. (Washkowitz, Jared) |