Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-34025
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-34025
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Harlin Dewayne Hale |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-34034 |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.
319 Paris Rd
Bogata, TX 75417-4111 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/15 5:44 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2023 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/15 5:42 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2023 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/15 5:39 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2023 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/15 5:37 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2023 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:22 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2022 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:21 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2022 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:19 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2022 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:17 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2022 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:16 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2021 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:14 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2021 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:12 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:08 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2021 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 03/08 4:05 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-34034 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2020 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Operating report
Mon 02/08 1:17 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period July 1, 2020 to September 30, 2020 filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order (generic)
Tue 03/17 3:29 PM
Amended Order Granting Motion for Final Decree entered in Lead case 17-34025 (ORDERED that Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc., Case No. 17-34034 hdh11 ("NHBogata") bankruptcy case shall remain open while NH Bogata collects receivables and distributes payments to its creditors. Entered on 3/17/2020 (Bradden, T.) |
|
utility
Reopen case
Tue 03/17 3:31 PM
Bankruptcy case reopened per Amended order entered in 17-34025 (Bradden, T.) |
||
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Final decree
Tue 01/28 10:14 AM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 1/28/2020 (Blanco, J.) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 10/12 12:17 PM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: Claim Number 5 Filed by Creditor Internal Revenue Service. (Bishop, Earl) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 11/30 9:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Elizabeth Weller filed by Red River CAD, Red River County. (Weller, Elizabeth) |
|
Sunday, November 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors
Sun 11/19 11:32 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11 & 12
Thu 11/16 4:35 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Dallas, Room 976. Proofs of Claims due by 3/14/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 12/18/2017. (Neary, William) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Statement of financial affairs
Tue 11/14 5:30 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. . (Kane, John) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Schedules
Tue 11/14 5:15 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. . (Kane, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Wed 11/08 2:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Aaron Michael Kaufman filed by Creditor Reliant Rehab Pro, LLC. (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC certificate of mailing
Thu 11/02 11:37 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Joint administration
Wed 11/01 1:31 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 3:17-bk-34025 with member case 3:17-bk-34034 Entered on 11/1/2017. OREDERED that all orders, pleadings, papers and documents, expect proofs of claims, lists, schedules, and statements, shall be filed and docketed in case number 17-34025 (the "Lead Case"); it is further ORDERED that all proofs of claim, lists, schedules, and statements shall be filed and docketed under the case number representing the estate in which the claim, list, schedule, or statements is made, and a creditor of more than one estate shall file and docket a proof of claim in each case to which a claim may be made, and only in the amount which the creditor may make a claim from that estate(Whitaker, Sheniqua) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of service
Tue 10/31 6:13 PM
Certificate of service re: Supplemental Certificate of Service regarding First Day Documents filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice (generic)
Tue 10/31 3:12 PM
Notice [Agenda of First Day Hearings and Index of First Day Pleadings] filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. . (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Official Service List | ||
15 | 15
motion
First day motions
Tue 10/31 3:02 PM
Amended Motion. [Amended Motion for Order Authorizing Continued Use of Cash Management System, Existing Bank Accounts, Existing Business Forms, and Maintenance of Existing Investment Practices] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Official Service List | ||
14 | 14
court
Notice of deficiency
Tue 10/31 11:08 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 11/13/2017. Schedule D due 11/13/2017. Schedule E/F due 11/13/2017. Schedule G due 11/13/2017. Schedule H due 11/13/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/13/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/13/2017. (Calfee, J.) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
List (witness/exhibit/generic)
Mon 10/30 8:46 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. . (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Service List | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of hearing
Mon 10/30 8:18 PM
Expedited Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. . Hearing to be held on 11/1/2017 at 09:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for7 and for2 and for6 and for8 and for4 and for3 and for5 , (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Service List | ||
11 | 11
motion
Employ
Mon 10/30 8:16 PM
Application to employ Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Service List | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Mon 10/30 8:02 PM
Declaration re: of Keith J. Mutschler in Support of Debtors' First Day Motions and Applications filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. . (Kane, John) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Expedite hearing
Mon 10/30 8:00 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Service List | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave (Not for Appeal use)
Mon 10/30 7:57 PM
Motion for leave [Motion to Preclude Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Service List | ||
7 | 7
motion
First day motions
Mon 10/30 7:55 PM
Motion to establish procedures to Protect Confidential Resident Information. Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Service List | ||
6 | 6
motion
Limit notice
Mon 10/30 7:51 PM
Ex Parte Motion to limit notice Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Official Service List | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Requirement | ||
5 | 5
motion
First day motions
Mon 10/30 7:48 PM
Motion to maintain bank accounts. [Motion for Order Authorizing Continued Use of Cash Management System, Existing Bank Accounts, Existing Business Forms, and Maintenance of Existing Investment Practices] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Service List | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pay pre-petition debt
Mon 10/30 7:46 PM
Motion to pay pre-petition debt [Motion to Approve Payment of Pre-petition Wages, Taxes and Benefits and To Continue Employee Programs in the Ordinary Course of the Debtors' Business] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Service List | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint administration
Mon 10/30 7:44 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 17-34025 17-34031 17-34034 17-34028 Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Service List | ||
2 | 2
motion
1st. Day - Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case
Mon 10/30 7:43 PM
Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Service List | ||
1 | 1
49
pgs
misc
Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer)
Mon 10/30 1:38 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Nexion Health at Bogata, Inc. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/30 1:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 17-34034 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 24384504, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |