Traxcell Technologies, LLC v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00721 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:183 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 29, 2018 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Traxcell Technologies, LLC
1405 Municipal Ave Suite 2305
Plano, TX 75074 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc.
Terminated: 01/23/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 04/15 4:10 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) |
|
24 | 24
order
Judgment
Wed 04/15 4:07 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT - ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All other relief not specifically granted herein is DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk is directed to keep the lead case (Case No. 2:17-cv-00718-RWS-RSP) open as other defendants remain in that case. However, the Clerk is directed to close the member case, Case No. 2:17-cv-00721-RWS-RSP. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/15/2020. (ch, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 02/12 1:24 PM
ORDER - Attorney Alison Haddock Hutton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2020. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 02/06 2:46 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ravinder Singh Deol terminated Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/06/2019. (klc, ) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 02/06 1:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP.(Deol, Ravinder) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, July 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 07/30 2:11 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/28/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 07/26 6:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants, filed by Traxcell Technologies, LLC.(Ramey, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C-1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C-2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit D-2 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/26 6:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Traxcell Technologies, LLC.(Ramey, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 03/27 12:52 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are consolidated for all pretrial issues (except venue) with Lead Case No. 2:17-cv-00718-RWS-RSP. Future filings should be made in the Lead Case. Member cases remain active for venue determinations and trial., Cases associated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/27/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/14 10:54 AM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Theresa A. Roozen on behalf of Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6650776. (Roozen, Theresa) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ranjini Acharya on behalf of Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6650733. (Acharya, Ranjini) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 01/24 7:43 AM
ORDER granting10 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/23/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/22 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravinder Singh Deol on behalf of Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP (Deol, Ravinder) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/22 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Christopher Rusnak on behalf of Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP (Rusnak, Eric) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 01/22 2:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Verizon Communications Inc. by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Heartfield, J) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/22 2:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP. (Heartfield, J) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/22 2:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, by Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP.(Heartfield, J) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/02 5:29 PM
NOTICE by Traxcell Technologies, LLC OF RELATED CASES (Ramey, William) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 12/18 9:42 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP ( Heartfield, J) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 12/18 1:46 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 1/22/2018; Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP to 1/22/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 11/27 10:15 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP (Heartfield, J) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 11/27 12:21 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 1/5/2018; Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP to 1/5/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/01 9:22 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Personal Communications, LP.(ch, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons(es) | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 11/01 8:03 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/1/2017. (ch, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/01 8:00 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Wed 11/01 8:04 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 10/31 6:07 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/31 6:05 PM
COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6534012.), filed by Traxcell Technologies, LLC.(Ramey, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D |