Raines et al v. NorthStar Installations, L.L.C. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-04969 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 30, 2018 4:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kevin Kappes
|
|
Defendant
NorthStar Installations, L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tim McGough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Raines
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/01 12:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors) re20 Order Dismissing Case,21 Judgment (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
21 | 21
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Fri 03/01 9:16 AM
JUDGMENT(CLK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/28 1:02 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/28/2019. (RJE) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 02/26 12:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors) re18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/26 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors) (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL REFILE. Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Cefalu, Amanda) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (JME) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Fri 02/08 3:06 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/8/2019. (TJB) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter re: withdrawal of motion
Fri 02/16 2:24 PM
Letter re: withdrawal of motion re10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to from Bryan J. Morben. (Morben, Bryan) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/01 3:01 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Per Plaintiff request, the hearing on Motion for Default set for Feb. 6 before Judge Wilhelmina Wright is CANCELLED. (TJB) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 12/19 2:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors) re13 Affidavit in Support,11 Notice of Hearing on Motion,10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ,12 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Morben, Bryan) |
|
13 | 13
respoth
Affidavit in Support
Tue 12/19 2:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs.(Morben, Bryan) Modified text on 12/19/2017 (kt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 12/19 2:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Tim McGough, Tim McGough, John Raines, John Raines, John Raines.(Morben, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 12/19 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to : Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Morben, Bryan) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 12/19 2:40 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Tim McGough, Tim McGough, John Raines, John Raines, John Raines. (Morben, Bryan) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 12/08 8:58 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kevin Kappes, NorthStar Installations, L.L.C. (LPH) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 12/07 12:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors) re7 Affidavit in Support,6 Application for Entry of Default (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
7 | 7
respoth
Affidavit in Support
Thu 12/07 12:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re6 Application for Entry of Default . (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Thu 12/07 12:22 PM
APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/09 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors). Kevin Kappes served on 11/2/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/09 1:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund, and each of their successors). NorthStar Installations, L.L.C. served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice - WMW Practice Pointers
Mon 11/06 10:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/01 1:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Kevin Kappes, NorthStar Installations, L.L.C.. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/01 1:08 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 17-cv-4969 WMW/DTS. (kt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/01 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Kevin Kappes, NorthStar Installations, L.L.C. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5794560) filed by John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Welfare Fund), John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund), John Raines(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough(as Trustee of the Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund). Filer requests summons issued. (Cefalu, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |