GiGi's Cupcakes LLC v. Country Charm Industries LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03011 |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 30, 2018 5:14 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Bruce Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Krista Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Natasha Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Country Charm Industries LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Mitchell Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
GiGi's Cupcakes LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Country Charm Industries LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruce Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Krista Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitchell Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Natasha Speidel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GiGi's Cupcakes LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Alan Thompson, TN
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Sovrano LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
KeyCorp LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Gigi's Operating LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Gigi's Holdings LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Gigi's Franchising LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
FundCorp Inc
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Food Business Services LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Gina Butler, TN
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Bruce Speidel
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Krista Speidel
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Mitchell Speidel
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Natasha Speidel
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Country Charm Industries LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/16 1:57 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by GiGi's Cupcakes LLC. (Coldwell, Deborah) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Consolidating Cases
Thu 02/01 8:48 AM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:17-CV-3009, 3:17-CV-3010, 3:17-CV-3011, 3:17-CV-3012, 3:17-CV-3013, 3:17-CV-3014, 3:17-CV-3015, 3:17-CV-3016, 3:17-CV-3017, 3:17-CV-3018 consolidated with lead case 3:17-cv-3009. United States Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver, currently assigned to 3:17-cv-3009-B, will continue as the Magistrate Judge in this consolidated action. All future docketing should be in lead case 3:17-cv-3009. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/31/2018) (zkc) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 01/18 4:04 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting18 Agreed Motion for Continuance of Status Conference. The Court resets the status conference for 1/31/18 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Counsel for all parties must attend. The parties, however, are instructed not to attend. Counsel should be prepared to discuss pretrial scheduling. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/18/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Wed 01/17 6:59 PM
Agreed MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by GiGi's Cupcakes LLC (Sanders, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 01/17 1:54 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Unopposed Motion for Extension. Plaintiff's answer to Defendants' counterclaims is now due March 5, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/17/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 01/12 4:08 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GiGi's Cupcakes LLC (Sanders, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate of Conference
Fri 01/12 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Conference re14 MOTION Join Additional Parties by James E Davis on behalf of Country Charm Industries LLC, Bruce Speidel, Krista Speidel, Mitchell Speidel, Natasha Speidel (Davis, James) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/11 12:25 PM
MOTION Join Additional Parties filed by Country Charm Industries LLC, Bruce Speidel, Krista Speidel, Mitchell Speidel, Natasha Speidel with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Davis, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/04 3:40 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Linton Wright. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/4/2018) (chmb) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/04 3:40 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony A. Garcia. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/4/2018) (chmb) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/04 3:39 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Cohen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/4/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/03 10:50 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney M. Linton Wright (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8895166) filed by Country Charm Industries LLC (Davis, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/03 10:47 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Anthony A. Garcia (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8895148) filed by Country Charm Industries LLC (Davis, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/03 10:43 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jeffrey Cohen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8895136) filed by Country Charm Industries LLC (Davis, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 01/02 4:59 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court sets a status conference hearing for 1/22/18 at 02:30 PM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Counsel for all parties must attend. The parties, however, are instructed not to attend. Counsel should be prepared to discuss pretrial scheduling. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/2/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 12/29 1:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Mitchell Speidel, Natasha Speidel, Bruce Speidel, Country Charm Industries LLC, Krista Speidel. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against GiGi's Cupcakes LLC, KeyCorp LLC, Gigi's Holdings LLC, Gigi's Franchising LLC, Gigi's Operating LLC, Food Business Services LLC, FundCorp Inc, SOVRANO, LLC, Alan Thompson, Gina Butler filed by Mitchell Speidel, Natasha Speidel, Bruce Speidel, Country Charm Industries LLC, Krista Speidel (Davis, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 11/13 12:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Country Charm Industries LLC. Waiver sent on 11/1/2017; Bruce Speidel. Waiver sent on 11/1/2017; Krista Speidel. Waiver sent on 11/1/2017; Mitchell Speidel. Waiver sent on 11/1/2017; Natasha Speidel. Waiver sent on 11/1/2017. (Sanders, John) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of Bruce Speidel, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of Krista Speidel, | ||
Att: 3 Waiver of Mitchell Speidel, | ||
Att: 4 Waiver of Natasha Speidel | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 11/03 1:59 PM
ORDER: This matter is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Jane J. Boyle for possible consolidation with 3:17-cv-03009-B. All future pleadings in this case shall be filed under case no. 3:17-cv-03011-B. Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/3/2017) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Lynn
Wed 11/01 8:51 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) Modified file date on 11/1/2017 (sss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/01 2:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GiGi's Cupcakes, LLC. (Sanders, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/01 12:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by GiGi's Cupcakes, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8775312) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanders, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet |