Eastman v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03046 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 02, 2018 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Eastman
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 11/14 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Boldt on behalf of Jeffrey Eastman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Boldt, Paige) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 11/14 9:35 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Jeffrey Eastman. (Boldt, Paige) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 11/14 3:35 PM
Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation of Dismissal. (twd) Docket text modified on 11/14/2019 (twd) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 11/03 1:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeffrey Eastman. (Thompson, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 11/03 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Jeffrey Eastman (Thompson, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Depuy Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. filed by Jeffrey Eastman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8782885) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Thompson, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |