Edwards v. Pike County Landfill
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07016 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pike County Landfill
PO Box 1229
Pikeville, KY 41502 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/23 9:50 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7016 Closed. (rah) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
utility
Stipulation
Wed 03/27 9:57 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Pike County Fiscal Court. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice
Wed 02/20 2:59 PM
Notice of Settlement Agreement Filed by J. Clair Edwards.(Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 9019 Motion and Settlement Agreement | ||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
order
Settlement Documents
Tue 02/05 1:16 PM
Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 2/26/2019 . (bjp) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice
Fri 02/01 1:58 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Pike County Fiscal Court. (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
utility
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/07 10:22 AM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Trial
Fri 12/21 4:06 PM
Third Amended Order for Trial. Trial date set for 4/30/2019 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (gsc) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 12/19 9:51 AM
Agreed Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 12/18 6:24 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher B. Madden | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 12/11 4:28 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Summary Chart of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proof of 8/25/15 Transfer in the | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Proof of 9/25/15 Transfer in the | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Proof of 10/21/15 Transfer in the | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Pike County Fiscal Courts | ||
38 | 38
misc
Report
Tue 12/11 4:25 PM
Joint Report of Settlement Conference , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Pike County Fiscal Court. (Irving, James) |
|
37 | 37
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 12/11 3:43 PM
Exhibit list filed by Pike County Fiscal Court. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Invoice List from April 30, 2016 to March 21, 2014 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proof of May 16, 2015 through February 16, 2016 Transfers in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Invoice of Credit on June 20, 2016 for $6,170.49 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Proof of Claim filed in Fortress Resources, LLC, Claim # 81-1 along with Stop Payment on Check No. 036983 dated October 30, 2015 in the amount of $32,455.41 | ||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
utility
Certificate of Service
Mon 09/10 3:11 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Trial
Mon 09/10 9:04 AM
Second Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
utility
Answer to Interrogatories
Wed 08/22 11:00 AM
Response to Request for Production of Documents, filed by Pike County Fiscal Court, Answer to Interrogatories , filed by Pike County Fiscal Court, Response to Request for Admissions, filed by Pike County Fiscal Court. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments to Main Document | ||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 07/11 2:24 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion For Set-Aside of Dates and Deadlines (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 07/10 5:50 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James R. Irving | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Setting Hearing
Tue 06/19 9:40 AM
Order Setting Status Hearing. Status hearing to be held on 7/18/2018 at 10:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
utility
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 04/17 1:12 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by Pike County Fiscal Court . (Pruitt, James) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
court
Summons Service Executed
Thu 04/05 12:48 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Trial
Wed 04/04 2:48 PM
Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 8/28/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
27 | 27
cmp
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 04/04 2:44 PM
Summons Re-Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/03 3:58 PM
Amended Complaint by J. Clair Edwards against J. Clair Edwards (Irving, James) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Alter or Amend
Thu 03/29 2:27 PM
Order GRANTING Motion to amend trustee's complaint (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Generic
Tue 03/20 4:24 PM
Contempt Order for failure to comply . (nbw) |
|
23 | 23
order
Continue Trial(O)
Tue 03/20 1:07 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (nbw) |
|
22 | 22
audio
Audio File
Tue 03/20 12:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/20/2018 9:39:19 AM ]. File Size [ 1044 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:21 ]. (admin) |
|
21 | 21
court
Hearing Held
Tue 03/20 11:50 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held . (nbw) |
|
20 | 20
court
Hearing Held
Tue 03/20 11:49 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held . (nbw) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Response
Mon 03/19 6:38 PM
Joint Response Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Pike County Landfill . (Irving, James) Modified on 3/20/2018 (nbw) |
|
18 | 18
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Mon 03/19 11:33 AM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Continue Trial
Mon 03/19 11:30 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Pike County Landfill. (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Show Cause
Fri 03/16 10:31 AM
Order to Show Cause for failure to comply with order [ECF No. 7]. Telephonic Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice
Wed 03/14 9:20 AM
Notice of Consent of Pike County Landfill and Pike County Fiscal Court to Trustee's First Amended Complaint Filed by Pike County Landfill. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
epo
Deficiency re Signature
Tue 03/13 11:07 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed Notice of Consent [ECF No. 12 ], filed herein on March 12, 2018, and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9011(a) and/or Section VI of the Administrative Procedures Manual, specifically, Signer on PDF does not match Certified User ECF login. It is ORDERED that said pleading may be STRICKEN from the record unless the deficiency is corrected within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise Date due: 3/20/2018.(nbw) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Alter or Amend
Mon 03/12 5:25 PM
Consent Motion to Amend Trustees Complaint to (I) Avoid Transfers Pursuant to Sections 547, 548, and 549 of the Bankruptcy Code and KRS § 378.020; (II) To Disallow Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (III) to Recover Property Transferred Pursuant to Section 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Plaintiff J. Clair Edwards). Last day to file objections: 3/26/2018 . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhbit B - Consent | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Mon 03/12 5:07 PM
Notice of Consent of Pike County Landfill and Pike County Fiscal Court to Trustee's First Amended Complaint to (I) Avoid Transfers Pursuant to Sections 547, 548 and 549 of the Bankruptcy Doce and KRS § 378.020; (II) to Dissallow Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (III) to Recover Property Tranferred Pursuan to Section 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Pike County Landfill. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Setting Hearing
Thu 02/22 9:20 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Telephonic hearing to be held on 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:02 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:40 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:15 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 3/27/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:17 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 9:10 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 11/06 3:54 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Mon 11/06 3:54 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:36 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07016 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 3:43 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 3:38 PM
Adversary case 17-07016 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Pike County Landfill Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |