Edwards v. Quality Magnetitie, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07017 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Quality Magnetitie, LLC
PO Box 671413
Dallas, TX 75267 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Sunday, July 29, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Sun 07/29 12:39 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7017 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
utility
Stipulation
Fri 07/20 4:30 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Remanding
Tue 06/05 3:38 PM
Order Remanding and Striking Hearing . (bjp) |
|
37 | 37
order
Continue Trial(O)
Tue 06/05 11:14 AM
Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Fri 06/01 4:03 PM
Proposed Order submitted by Christopher B. Rambicure . (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
epo
Deficiency re No Order Tendered
Wed 05/30 12:40 PM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the record and finding that no proposed order having been tendered with Motion to Continue Trial Deadlines [ECF No. 34 ] as required by KYEB LBR 9013-1(d), It is ORDERED that a proposed order shall be tendered within 3 working days from the date of this Order. If an order is not tendered, the Court may deny the requested relief [ECF No. 34]. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 05/29 10:00 PM
Motion to Continue Trial Deadlines pending Rule 9019 approval (action sought without notice and hearing pursuant to KYEB LBR 9013-1(c)), filed by Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
33 | 33
utility
Status Report
Tue 05/29 5:06 PM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Irving, James) |
|
32 | 32
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 05/29 5:05 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Summary Chart of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proof of 8/25/14 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Proof of 9/11/15 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Proof of 10/1/15 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Quality Magnetite, LLCs Responses to Requests for Admission | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice
Tue 05/29 4:23 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/15 3:13 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
29 | 29
order
Telephonic Pre-Trial
Tue 05/15 2:29 PM
Order relative to Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM. (bjp) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
utility
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/16 1:14 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Trial
Fri 04/13 2:43 PM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 6/26/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 04/11 4:31 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 04/10 9:22 PM
Second Joint Motion for Extension of All Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed and signed with permission by Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice
Fri 04/06 6:15 PM
Notice of Rejection of Offer of Judgment Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice
Fri 03/23 2:13 PM
Notice of Offer of Judgment Filed by Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Remanding
Wed 03/14 3:33 PM
Order Remanding and Striking Hearing . (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Response
Tue 03/13 9:29 PM
Response Filed by Quality Magnetite, LLC . (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
20 | 20
utility
Amended Answer
Tue 03/13 9:19 PM
Amended Answer with Statement Consenting to Entry of Final Judgment , filed by Quality Magnetite, LLC . (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
19 | 19
order
Show Cause
Tue 03/13 2:13 PM
Order to Show Cause for failure to comply with order [ECF No. 18]. Show Cause hearing to be held on 4/12/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
epo
File Statement re: Consent (Answers)
Fri 03/02 2:46 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim [ECF No. 17 ] filed by Christopher B. Rambicure on March 1, 2018 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that this pleading be amended within 7 days of the entry of this order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 3/9/2018.(nbw) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
answer|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim
Thu 03/01 2:36 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses , Counterclaim by Quality Magnetite, LLC against J. Clair Edwards Filed by Quality Magnetite, LLC . (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Certificate of Service
Thu 02/15 12:07 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
15 | 15
order
Trial
Thu 02/15 10:01 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 5/29/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 02/07 11:19 AM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion to extend all deadlines (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 02/06 2:31 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of All Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 02/06 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Rambicure Filed by on behalf of Quality Magnetite, LLC. (Rambicure, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
10 | 10
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 11/14 2:53 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
9 | 9
court
Summons Service Executed
Tue 11/14 2:52 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Trial
Mon 11/13 11:55 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 3/27/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Mon 11/13 11:54 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 11/09 11:01 AM
Amended Complaint by J. Clair Edwards against Quality Magnetitie, LLC (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Amend
Wed 11/08 12:53 PM
Order to amend Complaint . (nbw) |
|
4 | 4
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Wed 11/08 9:05 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:42 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07017 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:20 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 3:54 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 3:51 PM
Adversary case 17-07017 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Quality Magnetitie, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of Transfers |