Edwards v. Central Hydraulic Service, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07020 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Central Hydraulic Service, Inc.
PO Box 1170
Logan, WV 25601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/24 10:14 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7020 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/10 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Default Judgment
Tue 04/10 8:20 AM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Stay Order
Wed 03/21 9:40 AM
Order GRANTING Motion To Stay Order (nbw) |
|
24 | 24
order
Generic
Wed 03/21 9:39 AM
Contempt Order for failure to comply . (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stay Order
Tue 03/20 4:59 PM
Motion For Set-Aside Of Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
audio
Audio File
Tue 03/20 12:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/20/2018 9:46:32 AM ]. File Size [ 50 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:12 ]. (admin) |
|
21 | 21
audio
Audio File
Tue 03/20 12:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/20/2018 9:44:57 AM ]. File Size [ 384 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:36 ]. (admin) |
|
20 | 20
court
Hearing Held
Tue 03/20 11:47 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held . (nbw) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/19 4:53 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Central Hydraulic Service, Inc., filed by J. Clair Edwards. Last day to file objections: 4/2/2018 . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Claire Edwards in Support of Motiion for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Show Cause
Fri 03/16 10:34 AM
Order to Show Cause for failure to comply with order [ECF No. 7]. Telephonic Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/20 5:24 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
16 | 16
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 02/20 10:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 02/15 9:55 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. (nbw) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit
Wed 02/14 5:59 PM
Affidavit re Declaration of James R. Irving in Support of Application for Entry of Default , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James). Related document(s)15 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff J. Clair Edwards. Modified on 2/15/2018 (nbw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Service of Summons | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Form 2600- Entry of Default | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/14 5:57 PM
Document Terminated. See Corrected Entry [ECF No 15 ]. Any responsive pleadings should be related to ECF No. 15 Application for Entry of Default, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) Modified on 2/15/2018 (nbw) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Default Judgment
Thu 01/25 2:46 PM
Order DENYING Motion For Default Judgment (nbw) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 01/19 11:36 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Central Hydraulic Service, Inc., filed by J. Clair Edwards. Last day to file objections: 2/2/2018 . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:06 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:42 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:28 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 3/27/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:24 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 9:30 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 11/06 4:02 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Mon 11/06 4:02 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:46 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07020 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 4:33 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 4:29 PM
Adversary case 17-07020 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Central Hydraulic Service, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |