Edwards v. Fannin Enterprises, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07023 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Fannin Enterprises, Inc.
PO Box 981
Allen, KY 41601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/21 9:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7023 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
utility
Stipulation
Mon 04/23 3:04 PM
Stipulation Of Dismissal , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Fannin Enterprises, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Remanding
Tue 03/27 3:53 PM
Order Remanding and Striking May 29, 2018 trial . (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 02/28 12:13 PM
Notice of Filing of Amended and Agreed Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Fannin Enterprises, Inc. . (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice
Tue 02/27 11:24 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 01/17 9:22 AM
Agreed Order GRANTING Motion to extend deadline for filing response to complaint (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 01/16 4:32 PM
Joint Motion for Second Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint filed by J. Clair Edwards, Fannin Enterprises, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/12 4:01 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Trial
Mon 12/11 3:26 PM
First Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 5/29/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 12/06 1:51 PM
Order GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and For Set-Aside of the Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 12/05 12:13 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and For Set-Aside of the Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Fannin Enterprises, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:09 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:44 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:32 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 3/27/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:27 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 11:27 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 11:15 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 11:14 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:50 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07023 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 4:56 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 4:54 PM
Adversary case 17-07023 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Fannin Enterprises, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |