Edwards v. Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07025 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.
PO Box 76000
Detroit, MI 48279 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/14 2:36 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7025 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
utility
Stipulation
Mon 08/06 3:12 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
33 | 33
utility
Status Report
Mon 08/06 3:11 PM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
File (BNC)
Wed 08/01 12:14 PM
Order to File Joint Status Report . Document due by 8/14/2018. (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Vacating Order
Wed 06/20 5:33 PM
Order Vacating Order . (srw) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Settlement Documents
Thu 05/31 4:28 PM
Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 6/21/2018 . (bjp) |
|
29 | 29
order
Appear pro hac vice(Order)
Thu 05/31 8:25 AM
Order GRANTING Motion of Richard J. Parks to Appear pro hac vice Payment Due: 6/14/2018. (bjp) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Remanding
Thu 05/17 2:49 PM
Order Remanding and Striking . (bjp) |
|
27 | 27
order
Continue Trial(O)
Thu 05/17 2:44 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Wed 05/16 12:02 PM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice
Wed 05/16 11:50 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Continue Trial
Wed 05/16 11:49 AM
Joint Motion to Set-Aside of Dates and Deadlines Established in Amended Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
utility
Trial Brief
Mon 05/14 4:32 PM
Trial Brief, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - E-mails | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Charts | ||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 05/08 2:32 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice,filed by Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. Last day to file objections: 5/22/2018 . (McCabe, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Wed 05/02 4:20 PM
Witness and Exhibit list filed by Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. (McCabe, John) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 05/01 4:54 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Summary of Chart Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proof of 8/6/15 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Proof of 9/25/15 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Admission | ||
19 | 19
utility
Status Report
Tue 05/01 10:42 AM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Telephonic Pre-Trial
Wed 04/18 4:24 PM
Order relative to Telephonic Pre-Trial. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM. (bjp) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Amended Answer
Fri 01/19 11:34 AM
Amended Answer , filed by Joy Global Conveyors, Inc. . (McCabe, John) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
epo
File Statement re: Consent (Answers)
Wed 01/17 7:57 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer [ECF No. 15 ] filed by Joy Global Conveyors, Inc.. on January 16, 2018 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that this pleading be amended within 7 days of the entry of this order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 1/24/2018.(nbw) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/16 3:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Joy Global Conveyors, Inc. . (McCabe, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/12 3:57 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Trial
Mon 12/11 3:29 PM
First Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 5/29/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 12/06 1:52 PM
Order GRANTING Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and For Set-Aside of the Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 12/05 12:16 PM
Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and For Set-Aside of the Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:11 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:47 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:35 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 3/27/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:29 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 11:29 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 11:17 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 11:16 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:52 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07025 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 5:20 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 5:17 PM
Adversary case 17-07025 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Joy Global Conveyors, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |