Edwards v. Appalachian Security Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07028 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Appalachian Security Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/08 11:03 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7028 Closed. (rah) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Miscellaneous Relief Motion
Wed 11/15 9:51 AM
Order GRANTING Motion to waive filing fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 11/15 12:01 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07028 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE WAIVED- DUPLICATE FILING. (baa) Modified on 11/15/2017 (baa) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/14 9:44 AM
Trustee's Motion Waive Filing Fee, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Dismissal(Adversary)
Wed 11/08 11:13 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
3 | 3
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Wed 11/08 8:16 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/15/2017.(nbw) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
epo
3 DAY Order to Pay Filing Fee (Electronically Filed Documents ONLY)
Tue 11/07 2:53 PM
Deficiency - Action Required It appearing to the Court that the required fee of $350.00 was not paid for the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed on November 3, 2017, and the Court being otherwise properly and sufficiently advised, It is ORDERED that the fee shall be paid within 3 working days from the date of this order. /s/Judge Tracey N. Wise Filing Fee due by 11/13/2017.(nbw) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 5:53 PM
Adversary case 17-07028 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Appalachian Security Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhiibt A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |