Edwards v. Appalachian Security Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07029 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Appalachian Security Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 02/19 2:03 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7029 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
utility
Stipulation
Fri 02/01 2:01 PM
Stipulation Of Dismissal , filed by Appalachian Security Inc., J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
order
Settlement Documents
Mon 01/28 2:00 PM
Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 2/19/2019 . (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Remanding
Wed 10/17 2:52 PM
Order Remanding Second Amended Order for Trial and Striking Trial . (bjp) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice
Wed 10/17 11:21 AM
Notice of Agreed Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by Appalachian Security Inc., J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Generic
Thu 10/11 12:35 PM
Order. (bjp) |
|
37 | 37
audio
Audio File
Thu 10/11 11:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/11/2018 9:18:10 AM ]. File Size [ 2856 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:54 ]. (admin) |
|
36 | 36
audio
Audio File
Thu 10/11 11:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/11/2018 9:17:44 AM ]. File Size [ 103 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:26 ]. (admin) |
|
35 | 35
court
Hearing Held
Thu 10/11 10:36 AM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held . (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
utility
Trial Brief
Tue 10/09 5:12 PM
Trial Brief, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
33 | 33
utility
Trial Brief
Tue 10/09 3:37 PM
Trial Brief, filed by Appalachian Security Inc.. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Description of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Proof of Payment of Transfers | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Record of Transactions by Invoice History and Copies of Checks Issued by Fortress Resources LLC | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Thu 09/27 3:04 PM
Exhibit list filed by Appalachian Security Inc.. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Invoice List | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of 6-1-15 through 8-6-15 Transfers in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Invoices and Information from 6-1-15 through 8-3-15 Transfers | ||
Att: 4 Exhbit C - Continuation of Invoices and Information from 6-1-15 through 8-3-15 | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Wed 09/26 2:21 PM
Exhibit list filed by Appalachian Security Inc.. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Continued | ||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 09/25 3:41 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summary Chart of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Bj - Proof of 8/6/15 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proof of 8/13/15 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Appalachian Securitys Responses to Trustees Discovery Requests | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Invoice and Information Related to 8/6/15 Transfer | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Invoice and Information Related to 8/13/15 Transfer | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Invoice List | ||
29 | 29
utility
Status Report
Tue 09/25 3:34 PM
Status Report, filed by Appalachian Security Inc., J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Telephonic Pre-Trial
Mon 09/17 3:08 PM
Order Setting Telephonic PreTrial Conference. Telephonic PreTrial Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 09:15 AM. (bjp) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Trial
Fri 07/27 11:21 AM
Second Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 10/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Status Report
Mon 07/23 3:32 PM
Status Report, filed by Appalachian Security Inc., J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Sunday, July 15, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
File (BNC)
Mon 07/16 9:42 AM
Order to File Joint Status Report . Document due by 7/23/2018. (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 05/22 11:08 AM
Witness and Exhibit list filed by Appalachian Security Inc.. (Pruitt, James) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Setting Hearing
Mon 05/14 4:26 PM
Order Setting Mediation. Mediation scheduled for 6/7/2018 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Generic
Wed 05/09 3:00 PM
Order Referring to Mediation . (bjp) |
|
21 | 21
order
Miscellaneous Relief Motion
Wed 05/09 2:55 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion for Mediation (bjp) |
|
20 | 20
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 05/09 2:53 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/08 5:12 PM
Joint Motion for Mediation, filed by Appalachian Security Inc., J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Agreed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 05/08 5:11 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by Appalachian Security Inc., J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Irving | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Agreed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Amended Answer
Tue 01/09 10:19 AM
Amended Answer regarding Document # 16 adding Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) , filed by Appalachian Security Inc. . (Pruitt, James) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
epo
File Statement re: Consent (Answers)
Mon 01/08 3:16 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer [ECF No. 15 ] filed by Appalachian Security, Inc. on January 8, 2018 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that this pleading be amended within 7 days of the entry of this order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 1/16/2018.(nbw) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/08 11:06 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Appalachian Security Inc. . (Pruitt, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/12 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Trial
Tue 12/12 8:07 AM
First Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 6/26/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Trial(O)
Thu 12/07 2:27 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to COmplaint and For Set-Aside of the Deadlines Established in Scheduling Orde (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue Trial
Wed 12/06 6:52 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to COmplaint and For Set-Aside of the Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by Appalachian Security Inc. and J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:12 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:48 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:38 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:32 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 11:31 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 11:18 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 11:18 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:55 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07029 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 6:05 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 6:00 PM
Adversary case 17-07029 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Appalachian Security Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |