Edwards v. Banks Miller Supply
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07031 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Banks Miller Supply
PO Box 2947
Pikeville, KY 41502 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/13 10:09 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7031 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
utility
Stipulation
Tue 10/23 5:44 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Tro-Cal, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Remanding
Fri 10/12 11:05 AM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing . (bjp) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
answer
Response
Thu 10/11 4:31 PM
Response Filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
33 | 33
order
Show Cause
Thu 10/11 12:41 PM
Order to Show Cause for failure to comply with order [ECF No. 32]. Show Cause hearing to be held on 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Settlement Documents
Tue 07/31 4:28 PM
Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 8/21/2018 . (bjp) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Continue Trial(O)
Mon 07/09 1:38 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion for Set-Aside of Dates and Deadlines Established in Amended Scheduling Order (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 07/03 7:09 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Irving | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Agreed Order | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice
Tue 07/03 7:05 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Telephonic Pre-Trial
Wed 06/20 12:04 PM
Order relative to Telephonic Pre-Trial. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 01:30 PM. (bjp) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
utility
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/05 11:54 AM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Trial
Thu 04/05 8:52 AM
Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 7/31/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
25 | 25
order
Remanding
Thu 04/05 8:50 AM
Order Remanding and Striking Hearing . (bjp) |
|
24 | 24
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 04/04 2:57 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) Modified on 4/4/2018 to correct description of Order(bjp) |
|
23 | 23
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Wed 04/04 1:44 PM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
22 | 22
court
Defective Order
Wed 04/04 1:42 PM
Notice of Deficiency This Order is defective and the Court will not consider same until any deficiencies listed below have been corrected. The case caption is deficient. Case number is incorrect. Filer must correct and refile ONLY the proposed Order using the event code Adversary - Miscellaneous - Proposed Order Submitted. . (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 04/03 7:18 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Tro-Cal, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Agreed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Supplemental Document
Tue 03/27 6:03 PM
Supplemental Document Exhibit E - Discovery Responses of Tro-Cal, Inc. d/b/a Banks Miller Supply , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
19 | 19
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 03/27 5:35 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summary Chart of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of 8/6/2015 Transfer in the Form of Check Images | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proof of 9/17/2015 Transfer in the Form of Check Image | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proof of 9/29/2015 Transfer in the Form of Check Image | ||
18 | 18
utility
Status Report
Tue 03/27 5:32 PM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Tro-Cal, Inc.. (Irving, James) |
|
17 | 17
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 03/27 7:54 AM
Exhibit list filed by Tro-Cal, Inc.. (Lyon, James) |
|
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document Exhibit One | ||
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document new value invoices | ||
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document Exhibit two | ||
Att: 4 Continuation of Main Document new value calculations | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/16 3:45 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
15 | 15
order
Setting Hearing
Fri 03/16 10:44 AM
Order setting Pretrial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Answer to Interrogatories
Fri 03/09 7:55 AM
Answer to Interrogatories , filed by Tro-Cal, Inc.. (Lyon, James) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Response to Request for Admissions
Mon 02/26 2:31 PM
Response to Request for Admissions, filed by Tro-Cal, Inc.. (Lyon, James) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
utility
Amended Answer
Wed 12/13 9:14 AM
Amended Answer , filed by Tro-Cal, Inc. . (Lyon, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
epo
File Statement re: Consent (Answers)
Tue 12/12 11:41 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer [ECF No. 10 ] filed by Tro-Cal, Inc. on December 6, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that this pleading be amended within 7 days of the entry of this order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 12/19/2017.(nbw) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/06 2:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Tro-Cal, Inc. . (Lyon, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:49 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:39 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 11/08 9:56 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 2:46 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:33 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:57 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07031 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 6:19 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 6:16 PM
Adversary case 17-07031 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Banks Miller Supply Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of Transfers |