Edwards v. Xpress Service & Sales
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07034 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Xpress Service & Sales
12744 Kingston Pike Suite 202
Knoxville, TN 37934 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/24 10:25 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7034 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Dismissal(Adversary)
Mon 04/23 3:02 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Remanding
Tue 03/27 3:55 PM
Order Remanding and Striking June 26, 2018 trial . (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice
Tue 02/27 11:23 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Continue Trial(O)
Thu 01/18 11:53 AM
Order GRANTING Motion to extend deadline for filing response to complaint (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Continue Trial
Wed 01/17 3:45 PM
Trustee's Motion for Second Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/12 4:04 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Trial
Tue 12/12 8:09 AM
First Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 6/26/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Continue Trial(O)
Thu 12/07 2:29 PM
Order GRANTING Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and for Set-Aside of Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Continue Trial
Wed 12/06 1:41 PM
Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and for Set-Aside of Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:16 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:52 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:42 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 11/08 9:59 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 2:47 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:37 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:17 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07034 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 6:55 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 6:52 PM
Adversary case 17-07034 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Xpress Service & Sales Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfers |