Edwards v. Tramco Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07040 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tramco Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/18 12:32 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7040 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Dismissal(Adversary)
Wed 05/09 2:55 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Barber, T.) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Remanding
Mon 02/26 4:31 PM
Order Remanding and Striking Hearing . (gsc) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Thu 02/22 10:19 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Thu 11/16 10:27 AM
Certificate of Service , filed by T. Kent Barber . (Barber, T.) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Thu 11/16 9:48 AM
Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:48 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice
Wed 11/08 2:22 PM
Notice of Consent to Entry of Final Judgment Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 1:46 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 1:39 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 1:38 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Mon 11/06 10:16 AM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 7:13 PM
Adversary case 17-07040 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Tramco Services, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |