Edwards v. Paul M. Hogg
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07041 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Paul M. Hogg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/08 10:25 AM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7041 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
utility
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/19 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Default Judgment
Wed 04/18 2:32 PM
Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 04/17 2:56 PM
Supplemental Document, , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - SCRA Verification | ||
21 | 21
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 04/17 2:53 PM
Supplemental Document, , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - SCRA Verification | ||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Generic
Tue 04/10 12:55 PM
Order to Supplement . (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stay Order
Wed 03/21 12:25 PM
Order GRANTING Motion To Stay Order (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stay Order
Tue 03/20 5:01 PM
Motion For Set-Aside Of Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/19 5:05 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Paul M. Hogg, filed by J. Clair Edwards. Last day to file objections: 4/2/2018. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Claire Edwards in Support of Motion for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/20 5:25 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
15 | 15
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 02/20 10:03 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 02/15 10:55 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. (nbw) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Wed 02/14 6:29 PM
Affidavit re Declaration of James R. Irving in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James). Related document(s)14 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff J. Clair Edwards. Modified on 2/15/2018 (nbw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Service of Summons | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Form 2600 - Entry of Default | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/14 6:26 PM
Document Terminated. See Corrected Entry [ECF No 14 ]. Any responsive pleadings should be related to ECF No. 14 Application for Entry of Default, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) Modified on 2/15/2018 (nbw) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Default Judgment
Thu 01/25 2:50 PM
Order DENYING Motion For Default Judgment (nbw) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 01/19 11:40 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Paul M. Hogg, filed by J. Clair Edwards. Last day to file objections: 2/2/2018 . (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:18 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:53 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:49 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 11/08 10:02 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 2:48 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:41 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:24 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07041 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 7:22 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 7:18 PM
Adversary case 17-07041 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Paul M. Hogg Fee Amount 350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of the Transfer |