Edwards v. Lyon
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07043 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Paul Lyon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/14 2:38 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7043 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
utility
Stipulation
Wed 08/08 10:03 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal , filed by J. Clair Edwards, Paul Lyon. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
utility
Status Report
Wed 08/01 4:58 PM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Paul Lyon. (Irving, James) |
|
26 | 26
order
File (BNC)
Wed 08/01 12:16 PM
Order to File Joint Status Report . Document due by 8/14/2018. (bjp) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Remanding
Fri 06/29 8:14 AM
Order Remanding and Striking Trial and Telephonic Pretrial Conference . (bjp) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice
Wed 06/20 1:08 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Paul Lyon. (Irving, James) |
|
23 | 23
order
Telephonic Pre-Trial
Wed 06/20 12:10 PM
Order relative to Telephonic Pre-Trial. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 01:30 PM. (bjp) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
utility
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/05 11:56 AM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Trial
Thu 04/05 8:37 AM
Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 7/31/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
20 | 20
order
Remanding
Thu 04/05 8:33 AM
Order Remanding and Striking Hearing . (bjp) |
|
19 | 19
order
Continue Trial(O)
Wed 04/04 2:53 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) |
|
18 | 18
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Wed 04/04 1:34 PM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
17 | 17
court
Defective Order
Wed 04/04 1:23 PM
Notice of Deficiency This Order is defective and the Court will not consider same until any deficiencies listed below have been corrected. The case caption is deficient. Case number is incorrect. Filer must correct and refile ONLY the proposed Order using the event code Adversary - Miscellaneous - Proposed Order Submitted. . (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 04/03 7:14 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards, Paul Lyon. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Agreed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Wed 03/28 7:24 PM
Exhibit list filed by Paul Lyon. (Logsdon, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 03/27 6:10 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summary Chart of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of 3/21/2015 Transfer | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Voluntary Chapter 11 Petition and Schedules of Fortress Resources, LLC | ||
13 | 13
utility
Status Report
Tue 03/27 6:05 PM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/16 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
11 | 11
order
Setting Hearing
Fri 03/16 10:49 AM
Order setting Pretrial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:20 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:55 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:51 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:42 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 12:58 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 12:48 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 12:48 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:27 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07043 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 7:38 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 7:35 PM
Adversary case 17-07043 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Paul Lyon Fee Amount 350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfer | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of Transfer |