Edwards v. Whitecross
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07044 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
James Whitecross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 07/13 1:22 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7044 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Stipulation
Mon 07/09 10:04 AM
Stipulation Of Dismisal , filed by J. Clair Edwards, James Whitecross. (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Remanding
Tue 06/05 3:47 PM
Order Remanding and Striking . (bjp) |
|
24 | 24
order
Continue Trial(O)
Tue 06/05 3:46 PM
Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial (bjp) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Continue Trial
Tue 06/05 1:30 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial, filed by J. Clair Edwards, James Whitecross. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James R. Irving | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
utility
Status Report
Tue 05/29 5:31 PM
Status Report, filed by J. Clair Edwards, James Whitecross. (Irving, James) |
|
21 | 21
utility
Witness and/or Exhibit List
Tue 05/29 5:30 PM
Exhibit list filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Summary Chart of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proof of 3/31/15 Transfer | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Voluntary Chapter 11 Petition and Schedules of Fortress Resources, LLC | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice
Tue 05/29 4:40 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, James Whitecross. (Irving, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/15 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
18 | 18
order
Telephonic Pre-Trial
Tue 05/15 2:22 PM
Order relative to Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM. (bjp) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Amended Answer
Fri 12/29 9:54 AM
Amended Answer , filed by James Whitecross . (Hamilton, John) |
|
16 | 16
epo
File Statement re: Consent (Answers)
Fri 12/29 8:39 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer [ECF No. 15 ] filed by James Whitecross on December 28, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that this pleading be amended within 7 days of the entry of this order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 1/5/2018.(nbw) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/28 11:50 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by James Whitecross . (Hamilton, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/12 4:05 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Trial
Tue 12/12 8:12 AM
First Amended Order for Trial . Trial date set for 6/26/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Trial(O)
Thu 12/07 2:30 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and For Set-Aside of Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue Trial
Wed 12/06 5:05 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint and For Set-Aside of Deadlines Established in Scheduling Order, filed by J. Clair Edwards, James Whitecross. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/14 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher B. Madden Filed by on behalf of J. Clair Edwards. (Madden, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/10 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by James R. Irving . (Irving, James) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/10 3:55 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Irving, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:52 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Supplemental Document
Tue 11/07 2:44 PM
Supplemental Document, Statement of Consent , filed by J. Clair Edwards . (Irving, James) |
|
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 1:00 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 12:50 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 12:49 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/13 5:29 PM
COURT ENTRY- Filing fee for Complaint 17-07044 tnw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). FEE DEFERRED, amount due $ 350.00. (baa) Modified on 11/13/2017 (baa) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Fri 11/03 7:46 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 7:43 PM
Adversary case 17-07044 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against James Whitecross Fee Amount 350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Irving, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Details of Transfer | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Evidence of Transfer |