Styles For Less, Inc., a California corporation
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-14396 |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Styles For Less, Inc., a California corporation
1205 N Miller St
Anaheim, CA 92806-1933 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
1. | Styles for Less files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (usatoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 11/05/2017 4:00 PM PST |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 11/06 3:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-14396) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45905760. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
11
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 11/06 3:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Styles For Less, Inc., a California corporation List of Equity Security Holders due 11/20/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 11/20/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 11/20/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 11/20/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 11/20/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 11/20/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 11/20/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 11/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 11/20/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 11/20/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 11/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 11/20/2017. (Winthrop, Marc). TERMINATED Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT REQUIRED. Modified on 11/6/2017 (Roque, Jewell) |
|
2 | 2
194
pgs
misc
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)
Mon 11/06 3:15 PM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) and Master Mailing List Filed by Debtor Styles For Less, Inc., a California corporation. (Winthrop, Marc) |