Williams v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywel |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-02676 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Mon 11/20 7:15 AM
ORDER dismissing case. The Court's November 14, 2017 Order denying the petition 3 is VACATED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice under Fed.R.Civ.P., Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(I). The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/20/2017. (BGS) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Strike
Wed 11/15 11:13 AM
MOTION to Strike1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Antonius R. Williams.(DG) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/14 7:31 AM
ORDER: The petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/14/2017. (BGS) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Tue 11/07 12:58 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - HABEAS track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/21/2017. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/7/2017. (BGS) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for writ of habeas corpus
Tue 11/07 10:48 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State filed by Antonius R. Williams.(DG) Filing fee not paid. Modified on 11/7/2017 (DG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope |